EP3231122 - UPLINK TRANSMISSIONS IN AN UNLICENSED SPECTRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
LUO, Tao QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
WEI, Yongbin QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15820373.7 | 10.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015US64962 | Priority number, date | US201462090848P | 11.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462090848 P | US201514964323 | 09.12.2015 Original published format: US201514964323 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016094640 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3231122 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3231122 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04W74/00, H04W74/08, H04W72/12, // H04W74/02 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/21 (KR,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0035 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0073 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/0446 (KR,US);
H04W72/23 (KR,US);
H04W74/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W74/0808 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W88/02 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/42] | H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04W74/00, H04W74/08, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFWÄRTSSTRECKENÜBERTRAGUNGEN IN EINEM UNLIZENZIERTEN SPEKTRUM | [2017/42] | English: | UPLINK TRANSMISSIONS IN AN UNLICENSED SPECTRUM | [2017/42] | French: | TRANSMISSIONS EN LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN SPECTRE SANS LICENCE | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 03.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2015 | AL | 17.10.2018 | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | ES | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | HR | 17.10.2018 | IT | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | MK | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | RS | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | SM | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | IE | 10.12.2018 | LU | 10.12.2018 | MT | 10.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | NO | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
MT | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
MT | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009141736 (BECKER DONALD W [US]) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0074] ** paragraph [0093] *; | [XI]US2014112289 (KIM HAKSEONG [KR], et al) [X] 1,15,29,30 * paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0211] * [I] 2-14,16-28; | [XI]US2014341207 (BHUSHAN NAGA [US], et al) [X] 1,15,29,30 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0141] * * paragraph [0279] * * paragraph [0283] * [I] 2-14,16-28 |