EP3169355 - LISTERIA-BASED IMMUNOGENIC COMPOSITIONS FOR ELICITING ANTI-TUMOR RESPONSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advaxis, Inc. 305 College Road East Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | For all designated states The U.S.A. as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health 6001 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETIT, Robert 149 Parsons Lane Newtown (Wrightstown) Pennsylvania 18940 / US | 02 /
WALLECHA, Anu 201 Wildflower Circle Yardley Pennsylvania 19067 / US | 03 /
KHLEIF, Samir 13408 Hathaway Drive Silver Springs Maryland 20906 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Zhisong 8818 Tuckerman Ln. Potomac Maryland 20854 / US | 05 /
BERZOFSKY, Jay A. 5908 Bradley Blvd. Bethesda Maryland 20814 / US | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15821743.0 | 17.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015US40922 | Priority number, date | US201462026221P | 18.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462026221 P | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016011362 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169355 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/02, A61K35/74, A61K39/12, A61P35/00 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
A61K35/74 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/2818 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/522 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/523 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/572 (EP,US);
A61K2039/585 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6037 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6068 (EP,US);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
C07K2317/76 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/0011, A61K2300/00 (US,KR,EP);
A61K39/12, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | 23.12.2016 | ME | 23.12.2016 | Validation states | MA | 23.12.2016 | Title | German: | AUF LISTERIEN BASIERTE IMMUNOGENE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR AUSLÖSUNG VON ANTITUMORREAKTIONEN | [2017/21] | English: | LISTERIA-BASED IMMUNOGENIC COMPOSITIONS FOR ELICITING ANTI-TUMOR RESPONSES | [2017/21] | French: | COMPOSITIONS IMMUNOGÈNES À BASE DE LISTERIA POUR PROVOQUER DES RÉPONSES ANTI-TUMORALES | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 23.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/30] | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012121643 (DUBENSKY JR THOMAS W [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2014199258 (ROTHMAN JOHN [US]); |