EP3170142 - SERVICE MANAGEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MSC Consulting (S) Pte Ltd 1 Yishun Industrial Street 1 Singapore S768160 / SG | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOH, Kian Hwa 1 Yishun Industrial Street 1 04-27/28 A'POSH Bizhub Singapore 768160 / SG | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Wittmann, Günther Patentanwaltskanzlei Wittmann Frans-Hals-Straße 31 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Wittmann, Günther Wittmann Hernandez Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frans-Hals-Strasse 31 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15822070.7 | 03.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015SG50197 | Priority number, date | SG20141004112W | 16.07.2014 Original published format: SG10201404112W | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016010480 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3170142 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/40, G06Q50/10, G06Q30/06 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
G06Q20/401 (EP,US);
G06Q20/405 (US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/21] | G06Q50/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Title | German: | DIENSTVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/21] | English: | SERVICE MANAGEMENT METHOD | [2017/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE SERVICE | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 20.09.2017 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/27] | 11.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014149293 (LARACEY KEVIN [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061] ** paragraph [0079] * | International search | [Y]JP2002024668 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [Y] 7-8, 20* , paragraph [0030],Fig.2 & US 2001/0054006 A1 paragraph [0041],Fig.2 & KR 10-2001-0013295 A & CN 1330338 A *; | [Y]JP2004145499 (KONAMI ONLINE INC) [Y] 1-20 * , paragraphs [0029]-[0034],Fig.1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005004533 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 1-20 * , paragraphs [0016]-[0023], Fig.2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014099013 (BROTHER IND LTD) [Y] 3, 14 * , paragraph [0118] & US 2014/0137194 A1 paragraph [0125] & EP 2733599 A1 & CN 103813046 A * |