EP3169173 - MOLDED WATERSPORTS AND COLD CLIMATE ACCESSORIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solite Innovations LLC 141 Linden Avenue Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEISELMAN, James, Alexander 141 Linden Avenue Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Torti, Carlo Maria Emilio, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Torti, Carlo Maria Emilio, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 15822690.2 | 23.06.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015US37143 | Priority number, date | US201414332703 | 16.07.2014 Original published format: US201414332703 | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016010691 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169173 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3169173 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A41D27/24, A41D13/012, A43B5/08, // B29L31/48, A41D19/00, B29L31/50, A63B71/14, B29K75/00, B29C44/02 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
A41D19/0058 (EP);
A41D13/012 (EP);
A41D27/245 (EP);
A43B5/08 (EP);
A41D2400/10 (EP);
A41D2500/50 (EP);
A41D2600/10 (EP);
A63B2225/60 (EP);
A63B71/14 (EP);
B29C44/02 (EP);
B29K2075/00 (EP);
B29K2223/083 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/21] | A41D13/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFORMTES WASSERSPORT- UND KALTKLIMAZUBEHÖR | [2017/21] | English: | MOLDED WATERSPORTS AND COLD CLIMATE ACCESSORIES | [2017/21] | French: | ACCESSOIRES MOULÉS POUR SPORTS NAUTIQUES ET CLIMAT FROID | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 15.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2015 | AL | 08.01.2020 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | ES | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | IT | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | IE | 23.06.2020 | LU | 23.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 23.06.2015 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.06.2015 | |
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2079137 (KING ALAN CHARLES, et al) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [Y]US7891116 (IGLIKOV NIKOLAY [US]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 4 *; | [Y]GB2490554 (SHEI CHUNG HSIN IND CO LTD [TW]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2749551 (GARBELLANO DAVID W) [Y] 22* entire document *; | [Y]US4503565 (LIPPITT JR MAXWELL W [US], et al) [Y] 19 * entire document *; | [Y]US5167551 (DAVIS ROBERT G [US]) [Y] 1, 2, 4-10, 17, 19-22 * entire document *; | [Y]US5983396 (MORROW DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1, 2, 4-10, 17, 19-22 * entire document *; | [Y]US2002010957 (KATZ NEAL E [US]) [Y] 21 * entire document *; | [Y]US2008201823 (JAEGER ERIC M [US]) [Y] 10 * entire document *; | [Y]US2010151176 (LY JOHN THIET [US], et al) [Y] 5 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012266359 (GELLIS DAVID [US]) [Y] 7, 8 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013254963 (MILCZARCZYK BARTOSZ [AU], et al) [Y] 4 * entire document * |