EP3384417 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SECURING A CLIENT'S ACCESS TO A DRM AGENT'S SERVICES FOR A VIDEO PLAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orca Interactive Ltd. P.O. Box 2220 22 Zarhin Street 4366248 Ra'anana / IL | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOUEG, Yaacov 16 HaPrachim Street 4339960 Ra'anana / IL | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 15823204.1 | 03.12.2015 | [2018/41] | WO2015IL51177 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017093990 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384417 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3384417 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/10, H04L9/06, H04L29/06 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/0807 (US);
H04L63/10 (US);
H04L9/0643 (US);
H04L2463/101 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/41] | G06F21/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SICHERUNG DES ZUGANGS ZU EINEM DIENST EINES DRM-AGENTEN FÜR EINEN VIDEOSPIELER | [2018/41] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SECURING A CLIENT'S ACCESS TO A DRM AGENT'S SERVICES FOR A VIDEO PLAYER | [2018/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR SÉCURISER UN ACCÈS D'UN CLIENT À DES SERVICES D'UN AGENT DRM POUR UN LECTEUR VIDÉO | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 06.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2015 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | TR | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | IE | 03.12.2020 | LU | 03.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 03.12.2015 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MK | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 03.12.2020 | ||
LU | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.12.2015 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 03.12.2020 | ||
LU | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 03.12.2020 | ||
LU | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0058810 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * pages 29-39; figures 5A-B *; | [A]EP1942430 (APPLE INC [US]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]WO2011041916 (QUICKPLAY MEDIA INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] * | by applicant | WO2007077362 | US2009165148 | US9027143 |