EP3230120 - ARMREST ASSEMBLY FOR VEHICLE INTERIOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Yanfeng Jinqiao Automotive Trim Systems Co., Ltd. No. 2166 Jufeng Road Pudong New Area Shanghai / CN | For all designated states Anderson, Rick A. 13636 Lincoln Street Grand Haven, Michigan 49417 / US | For all designated states Hodgson, Thomas Scott 1009 E 10th Street Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | For all designated states Nurenberg, Randy William 4505 Bridgeville Court Hudsonville, Michigan 49426 / US | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Rick A. 13636 Lincoln Street Grand Haven, Michigan 49417 / US | 02 /
HODGSON, Thomas Scott 1009 E 10th Street Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | 03 /
NURENBERG, Randy William 4505 Bridgeville Court Hudsonville, Michigan 49426 / US | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 15823432.8 | 11.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015US65345 | Priority number, date | US201462091329P | 12.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462091329 P | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016094844 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230120 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3230120 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/75 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
B60N2/793 (EP,US);
B60N2/767 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/42] | B60N2/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARMLEHNENEINHEIT FÜR FAHRZEUGINNENRAUM | [2017/42] | English: | ARMREST ASSEMBLY FOR VEHICLE INTERIOR | [2017/42] | French: | ENSEMBLE ACCOUDOIR POUR INTÉRIEUR DE VÉHICULE | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 02.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2015 | AL | 14.11.2018 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | IT | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | RS | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | SM | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | IE | 11.12.2018 | LU | 11.12.2018 | MT | 11.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | FR | 14.01.2019 | BG | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
MT | 11.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
MT | 11.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.12.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [I]FR2792590 (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]) [I] 1 * figures 1-8 *; | [I]US6286793 (HIROSE TSUGIO [JP], et al) [I] 1 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2007261435 (INOUE MTP KK) [X] 1,11,12 * abstract * [I] 1-10,13-17; | [X]DE102009007723 (BOS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XI]FR2961763 (EUROSTYLE SYSTEMS [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12 * the whole document * [I] 4,11-17; | [I]WO2014047290 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]) [I] 1* figures 1-8 * | by applicant | DE102007024000 |