EP3238211 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO VOICE QUALITY ESTIMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Doh-Suk c/o Dolby Laboratories, Inc. 1275 Market Street San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Shen Guandongdian Building 15-02 East 3rd Ring Road Beijing 100022 / CN | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Application number, filing date | 15825864.0 | 23.12.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015IB59962 | Priority number, date | WO2014CN94673 | 23.12.2014 Original published format: PCT/CN2014/094673 | EP20150152715 | 27.01.2015 Original published format: EP 15152715 | US201562128382P | 04.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562128382 P | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016103222 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3238211 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3238211 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G10L25/60, H04M3/22, H04L12/24, H04L12/26 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
H04M3/2236 (EP,CN,US);
H04L43/04 (US);
H04L43/0829 (EP,US);
G10L25/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG BEI DER SPRACHQUALITÄTSSCHÄTZUNG | [2020/15] | English: | METHODS AND DEVICES FOR IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO VOICE QUALITY ESTIMATION | [2017/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS POUR DES AMÉLIORATIONS RELATIVES À L'ESTIMATION DE LA QUALITÉ VOCALE | [2017/44] |
Former [2017/44] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR VERBESSERUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT SPRACHQUALITÄTSCHÄTZUNG | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 02.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20196610.8 / EP3787270 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2015 | AL | 21.10.2020 | AT | 21.10.2020 | CY | 21.10.2020 | CZ | 21.10.2020 | DK | 21.10.2020 | EE | 21.10.2020 | ES | 21.10.2020 | FI | 21.10.2020 | HR | 21.10.2020 | IT | 21.10.2020 | LT | 21.10.2020 | LV | 21.10.2020 | MC | 21.10.2020 | MK | 21.10.2020 | MT | 21.10.2020 | NL | 21.10.2020 | PL | 21.10.2020 | RO | 21.10.2020 | RS | 21.10.2020 | SE | 21.10.2020 | SI | 21.10.2020 | SK | 21.10.2020 | SM | 21.10.2020 | TR | 21.10.2020 | IE | 23.12.2020 | LU | 23.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | BG | 21.01.2021 | NO | 21.01.2021 | GR | 22.01.2021 | IS | 21.02.2021 | PT | 22.02.2021 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 23.12.2015 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
MK | 21.10.2020 | ||
MT | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
TR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.12.2015 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
MT | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
TR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 23.12.2020 | ||
LU | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 21.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2006035269 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [US], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0084] * [I] 4-6; | [Y]US2009076829 (RAGOT STEPHANE [FR], et al) [Y] 9,10 * paragraph [0084] * * figure 5 *; | [XY] - DING ET AL, "Non-intrusive single-ended speech quality assessment in VoIP", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070601), vol. 49, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.SPECOM.2007.04.003, ISSN 0167-6393, pages 477 - 489, XP022113625 [X] 1-6,11-15 * Section 2.1 * * Section 3 * * figures 2, 3 * [Y] 9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.specom.2007.04.003 | [XI] - UEMURA S ET AL, "Objective speech quality assessment based on payload discrimination of lost packets for cellular phones in NGN environment", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (20081101), vol. E91-B, no. 11, doi:10.1093/IETCOM/E91-B.11.3667, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 3667 - 3676, XP001519001 [X] 1,4,6,14,15 * Section 4 * * figures 3, 4 * [I] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ietcom/e91-b.11.3667 | [A] - NISHIKAWA K ET AL, "EXTENSION OF IMAGE TRANSPORT PROTOCOL ALLOWING SEVER-SIDE CONTROL OF REQUEST FOR RETRANSMISSION", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS,COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, ENGINEERING SCIENCES SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (20040301), vol. E87-A, no. 3, ISSN 0916-8508, pages 674 - 681, XP001190007 [A] 7,8 * Section 3 * | [XAYI] - SOFIENE JELASSI ET AL, "Voicing-aware parametric speech quality models over VoIP networks", INFORMATION INFRASTRUCTURE SYMPOSIUM, 2009. GIIS '09. GLOBAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090623), ISBN 978-1-4244-4623-0, pages 1 - 8, XP031558369 [X] 16,21-23,27,29,30 * Section IV - Section VI * * figure 7 * [A] 26 [Y] 18 [I] 17,19,20,24,25,28 | [A] - LINGFEN SUN ET AL, "Voice quality prediction models and their application in VoIP networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIMEDIA, (20060801), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1109/TMM.2006.876279, ISSN 1520-9210, pages 809 - 820, XP055208109 [A] 16 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMM.2006.876279 | [X] - Tiago Falk, "Blind Estimation of Perceptual Quality for Modern Speech Communications", Canadian theses, Kingston, Ontario, Canada, (20081222), URL: http://hdl.handle.net/1974/1642, (20150817), XP055208123 [X] 16,17,29,30 * page 32 - page 44 * * page 51 * | [Y] - LEMAN ADRIEN ET AL, "Hybrid Model for Non-Intrusive Speech Quality Evaluation in Telephony Applications", CONFERENCE: 38TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE: SOUND QUALITY EVALUATION; JUNE 2010, AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (20100613), XP040567008 [Y] 18 * page 1 * | by applicant | US2009094026 |