EP3174620 - THREE WAY CATALYTIC CONVERTER USING HYBRID CATALYTIC PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2018/47] |
Former [2017/23] | For all designated states SDCmaterials, Inc. 940 S. Park Lane, Suite 2 Tempe, AZ 85281 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIN, Qinghua c/o SDCmaterials Inc. 940 S. Park Lane Suite 2 Tempe, AZ 85281 / US | 02 /
QI, Xiwang c/o SDCmaterials. Inc. 940 S. Park Lane Suite 2 Tempe, AZ 85281 / US | 03 /
BIBERGER, Maximilian A. c/o SDCmaterials Inc. 940 S. Park Lane Suite 2 Tempe, AZ 85281 / US | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Muley, Ralf, et al Umicore AG & Co. KG Patente Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Bailey, Sam Rogerson, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15826305.3 | 28.07.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015US42457 | Priority number, date | US201462030557P | 29.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462030557 P | US201462054251P | 23.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462054251 P | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016018903 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3174620 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J23/464 (US);
B01J23/58 (US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
B01J35/23 (EP);
B01J35/393 (EP);
B01J35/56 (US);
B01J37/0215 (US);
B01J37/0244 (EP,US);
B01J37/0248 (EP);
B01J37/08 (EP);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1025 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2042 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2065 (EP,US);
B01D2255/407 (EP,US);
B01D2255/902 (EP,US);
B01D2255/908 (EP,US);
B01D2255/91 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Title | German: | DREIWEGEKATALYSATOR MIT VERWENDUNG HYBRIDER KATALYTISCHER PARTIKEL | [2017/23] | English: | THREE WAY CATALYTIC CONVERTER USING HYBRID CATALYTIC PARTICLES | [2017/23] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR CATALYTIQUE À TROIS VOIES EMPLOYANT DES PARTICULES CATALYTIQUES HYBRIDES | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 27.10.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 24.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011152550 (GREY ROGER A [US], et al) [A] 1,13* paragraphs [0015] - [0019] *; | [XP]WO2015061482 (SDCMATERIALS INC [US]) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0081] - [0085] - [0112] , [0113] , [0118] - [0122] - [0126] - [0130] * | International search | [Y]US2012214666 (VAN DEN HOEK WILBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 37-39, 69-71, 99-101, 122-124, 153-155, 184-186* entire document *; | [Y]US2014140909 (QI XIWANG [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 37-39, 69-71, 99-101, 122-124, 153-155, 184-186 * entire document * |