EP3176614 - OPTICAL FILM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING OPTICAL FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta, Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOYAMA, Hirokazu c/o KONICA MINOLTA INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15827483.7 | 28.07.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015JP71303 | Priority number, date | JP20140154393 | 30.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014154393 | [2017/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016017604 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176614 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/22, B32B23/08, B32B23/22, B32B27/18, B32B27/30, C09D5/32, C09D101/00, C09D129/04, G02B5/26, G02B5/28 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
B05D1/02 (US);
B05D1/28 (US);
B05D1/305 (US);
B05D1/42 (US);
B32B23/08 (EP,US);
B32B23/22 (EP,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/30 (EP,US);
C09D101/00 (EP,US);
C09D101/02 (US);
C09D129/04 (EP,US);
C09D5/004 (US);
C09D5/32 (EP,US);
C09D7/40 (EP,US);
G02B1/10 (US);
G02B5/085 (US);
G02B5/208 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/23] | G02B5/22, B32B23/08, B32B23/22, B32B27/18, B32B27/30, C09D5/32, C09D7/12, C09D101/00, C09D129/04, G02B5/26, G02B5/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER FILM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES OPTISCHEN FILMS | [2017/23] | English: | OPTICAL FILM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING OPTICAL FILM | [2017/23] | French: | FILM OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN FILM OPTIQUE | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2016 | Translation filed | 21.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 21.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2011178825 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN) [X] 1 * claims 7, 11, 12 * * paragraph [0043] * [Y] 6-8,15-17 [I] 2,10,11,14; | [Y]EP2597495 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP]) [Y] 6-8,15-17* claim 1 *; | [XY]WO2013107081 (SHANGHAI INST CERAMICS [CN], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10,14 * examples 1-5; tables 1, 2 * [Y] 6-8,15-17; | [P]US2015132494 (LUO HONGJIE [CN], et al) [P] * page 8; tables 1, 2 * * paragraph [0069] * | International search | [X]JP2004346260 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD) [X] 1, 6, 9-10, 15 * , claims; paragraphs [0012], [0017]; synthesis examples; examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010031235 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [A] 1-17 * , claims; paragraphs [0049], [0077], [0079]; examples & US 2011/0095242 A1 & WO 2010/001669 A1 & CN 102066261 A *; | [X]JP2011178825 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN) [X] 1, 6, 9-10, 15 * , claims; paragraphs [0043], [0066], [0085]; examples (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2012014655 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP], et al) [Y] 7-8, 16-17 * , claims; examples 1 to 3, 7, 9 & JP 5720685 B & US 2013/0114131 A1 claims; examples 1 to 3, 7, 9 & EP 2597495 A1 & CN 103003727 A *; | [A]JP2012141353 (HIRAOKA & CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013075806 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * , claims; paragraph [0036]; examples 3 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [XY]WO2013107081 (SHANGHAI INST CERAMICS [CN], et al) [X] 1-6, 9-11, 14-15 * , claims; example 1; paragraphs [0024], [0061] to [0062], [0105]; fig. 2 to 3 & JP 2015-513508 A & US 2015/0132494 A1 claims; example 1; paragraphs [0024], [0041] to [0042], [0098]; fig. 2 to 3 & CN 103073943 A * [Y] 7-8, 16-17; | [A]JP2013184091 (KURARAY CO, et al) [A] 1-17 * , claims; paragraph [0025]; examples (Family: none) *; | [PX]JP2015063453 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [PX] 1-4, 6, 9-11, 15* , claims; paragraphs [0010], [0023]; examples 1 to 2 (Family: none) * |