EP3175811 - MEDICAL MANIPULATOR AND TREATMENT INSTRUMENT PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIDA, Masatoshi c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
KOMURO, Takahiro c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15828083.4 | 14.05.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015JP63932 | Priority number, date | JP20140156152 | 31.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014156152 | [2017/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016017237 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3175811 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/00, B25J3/00, A61B90/96, A61B90/90, A61B90/98, A61B50/30, // A61B34/37 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
A61B90/96 (EP);
A61B34/37 (US);
A61B34/71 (EP,US);
A61B34/74 (EP,US);
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
A61B90/90 (EP);
A61B90/98 (EP);
B25J3/00 (EP,US);
B25J9/1689 (US);
A61B17/29 (US);
A61B18/1482 (US);
A61B2034/742 (US);
A61B2034/743 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/23] | A61B34/00, B25J3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHER MANIPULATOR UND BEHANDLUNGSINSTRUMENTENVERPACKUNG | [2017/23] | English: | MEDICAL MANIPULATOR AND TREATMENT INSTRUMENT PACKAGE | [2017/23] | French: | MANIPULATEUR MÉDICAL ET ENSEMBLE D'INSTRUMENTS DE TRAITEMENT | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2017 | Translation filed | 31.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 31.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9903055 (BROOKS AUTOMATION INC [US]) [A] 6,7* abstract *; | [Y]WO03081379 (ALCON INC [CH], et al) [Y] 8-11 * figure 2 *; | [XYI]JP2004129782 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0018] - [2068] - [0069]; figure 1 * [Y] 8-11 [I] 3; | [I]EP1886621 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [I] 6,7 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2011144806 (SANDHU KULBIR S [US], et al) [I] 6,7 * paragraph [0050]; figure 9 *; | [XI]US2014160015 (OGAWA RYOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0235] - [0240]; figure 11 * [I] 2,3; | [E]EP3159116 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [E] 1,3-5 * paragraphs [0045] - [0048]; figure 2 * | International search | [Y]JP2001509441 (Brooks Automation, Inc.) [Y] 6-7 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0010]; fig. 1 & AU 7823398 A & EP 0996920 A1 & JP 2009-061586 A & JP 5537017 B2 & JP 2014-076536 A & TW 430599 B & US 5991510 A & WO 1999/003055 A1 description, page 4, line 32 to page 6, line 28; fig. 1 *; | [XYA]JP2004129782 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-2, 4 * , paragraphs [0013] to [0069]; fig. 1 to 3 & JP 3934524 B2 * [Y] 8-10 [A] 3, 5-7, 11; | [Y]JP2005519706 (Alcon, Inc.) [Y] 8-11* , paragraphs [0014] to [0020]; fig. 1 to 6 & AR 038705 A1 & AT 359035 T & AU 2003209141 A1 & AU 2003209141 B2 & BR 0303568 A2 & CA 2447848 A1 & CA 2447848 C & DE 60313084 T2 & DK 1384132 T3 & EP 1384132 A2 & EP 1384132 A4 & EP 1384132 B1 & ES 2283753 T3 & JP 2008-279263 A & MX PA03009200 A & PT 1384 *; | [Y]JP2009131374 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP) [Y] 6-8, 10-11 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0058]; fig. 1 to 3 & JP 4580973 B2 & CN 101444415 A & CN 101444415 B & EP 2064984 A2 & EP 2064984 A3 & EP 2064984 B1 & EP 2213221 A1 & US 2009/0143642 A1 paragraphs [0023] to [0072]; fig. 1 to 3 * |