EP3237810 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING VENTILATION EQUIPMENT, VENTILATION EQUIPMENT INCLUDING SUCH A CONTROL SYSTEM, AND RANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2020 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amphoux, André 12, rue Jules César F-75012 Paris / FR | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Derambure Conseil c/o Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Derambure Conseil 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15828361.4 | 22.12.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015FR53712 | Priority number, date | FR20140063183 | 23.12.2014 Original published format: FR 1463183 | [2017/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016102885 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3237810 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
F24F11/0001 (EP,RU);
F24F11/64 (EP,RU,US);
F24F11/77 (EP,RU,US);
F24F11/30 (EP);
F24F11/61 (EP);
F24F2007/001 (EP,RU,US);
F24F2110/00 (EP);
F24F2110/10 (EP);
F24F2110/12 (EP);
F24F2110/20 (EP);
F24F2110/32 (EP);
F24F2110/66 (EP);
F24F2110/70 (EP);
F24F2110/72 (EP);
F24F2130/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BELÜFTUNGSANLAGE, BELÜFTUNGSANLAGE MIT SOLCH EINEM STEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND BEREICH | [2017/44] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING VENTILATION EQUIPMENT, VENTILATION EQUIPMENT INCLUDING SUCH A CONTROL SYSTEM, AND RANGE | [2017/44] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE D'INSTALLATIONS DE VENTILATION, INSTALLATION DE VENTILATION COMPRENANT UN TEL SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE, ET GAMME | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 26.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US6241604 (COLTER WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 1,7 * column 3, paragraphs 35-65; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 2-6,8-13; | [XDI]FR2851641 (ASTATO [FR]) [XD] 1-4,6,7,12 * the whole document * [I] 5,8-11,13; | [XI]WO2007139507 (VENTOTECH AB [SE], et al) [X] 1 * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 13; figures 2,3; claim 1 * [I] 2-13; | [X]DE102008044439 (PILZ WOLFRAM [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]WO2012000265 (ZTE CORP [CN], et al) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]DE102010055065 (SEIFARTH RENATE [DE]) [X] 1,11 * abstract *; | [X]FR3001528 (PILOT ANDRE JEAN MARIE [FR]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 20; figure 3 * | by applicant | FR2851641 |