EP3177327 - INHIBITORS OF MYH7B AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miragen Therapeutics, Inc. 6200 Lookout Road Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTGOMERY, Rusty 6200 Lookout Road Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | 02 /
DALBY, Christina 6200 Lookout Road Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 15829559.2 | 04.08.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015US43571 | Priority number, date | US201462033018P | 04.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462033018 P | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016022536 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3177327 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/712 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61K2300/00 (KR,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (KR,US);
C12N2310/322 (US);
C12N2310/3231 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3341 (EP,US);
C12N2310/341 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7105, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/713, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | A61K48/00, C07H21/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN VON MYH7B UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/24] | English: | INHIBITORS OF MYH7B AND USES THEREOF | [2017/24] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE MYH7B ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2017/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 02.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 22.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007042982 (BENTWICH ITZHAK [IL]) [X] 1 * sequence 47581 *; | [X]WO2013173601 (RANA THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * sequence 38094 *; | [I] - RUSTY L MONTGOMERY ET AL, "Therapeutic inhibition of miR-208a improves cardiac function and survival during heart failure", vol. 124, no. 14, doi:10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.111.030932, ISSN 1524-4539, (20110101), pages 1537 - 1547, 1, CIRCULATION, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, INC, & SCIENTIFIC SESSIONS OF THE AMERICAN-HEART-ASSOCIATION / RESUSCITATION SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM; NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA; NOVEMBER 12 -16, 2016, URL: http://circ.ahajournals.org/content/124/14/1537, (20110906), XP002674571 [I] 1,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.111.030932 | [ ] - "Human bioinformatically detectable RNA oligonucleotide SEQ ID 47581.", Geneseq, (20081030), Database accession no. ASP65840, URL: EBI, XP055448270 [ ] * the whole document * | [ ] - "Human BDNF oligonucleotide, SEQ:38094.", Geneseq, (20140116), Database accession no. BBA06210, URL: EBI, XP055448273 [ ] * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2005255487 (KHVOROVA ANASTASIA [US], et al) [A] 2, 3, 5, 22, 23, (24-25)/(2, 3, 5, 22, 23)* SEQ ID NO: 1672865 (SEQ ID NO: 2269522, SEQ ID NO:2269583, SEQ ID NO: 2533158, SEQ ID NO: 2643889), nucleotides 19-6 *; | [YA]WO2012140234 (VIB VZW [BE], et al) [Y] 24/1 * claims 2, 3, pg 24 * [A] 25/1; | [XYA]US2013331433 (THIBONNIER MARC [US]) [X] 1 * pg 35, Table 8, hsa-miR-1443p * [Y] 7-16, 18-20, 24/(1, 7-16, 18-20) [A] 2, 3, 5, 22, 23, 24/(2, 3, 5, 22, 23), 25; | [YA]US2013344135 (VAN ROOIJ EVA [NL], et al) [Y] 7-16, 18-20, 24/(7-16, 18-20) * claims 1, 6-9, 14, 29-31; para [0007]-[0010] * [A] 25/(7-16, 18-20); | [A] - "Homo sapiens myosin, heavy chain 7B, cardiac muscle, beta (MYH7B), mRNA", NCBI, (20140621), Database accession no. NM_020884.4 [A] 1-3, 5, 7-16, 18-20, 22-25 * ; in entirety * | [YA] - HU et al., "An Agomir of miR-144-3p Accelerates Plaque Formation through Impairing Reverse Cholesterol Transport and Promoting Pro-Inflammatory Cytokine Production.", PLoS ONE, (20140414), vol. 9, no. 4, page e94997, XP055395095 [Y] 7-16, 18-20, 24/(7-16, 18-20) * ; Abstract * [A] 25/(7-16, 18-20) DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0094997 | by applicant | US5270163 | US5783565 | US5837533 | US5981505 | US6127170 | US6217900 | US6379965 | US6383512 | US6403566 | US6416510 | US6589286 | WO03093449 | WO2004004602 | US6693187 | US6716196 | US6716242 | US6747014 | US6838283 | WO2005082440 | US6953466 | US7041127 | US7055237 | US7067641 | US2006148742 | US7083642 | US7087263 | WO2006089340 | US7105018 | US7144422 | US7156869 | US2007060907 | US7202227 | US7232573 | US7236821 | US7247313 | US2007203445 | US7273493 | US7294329 | US2009264508 | US2011076322 | WO2012083005 | WO2013192486 | - TEEKAKIRIKUL et al., "Hypertrophic cardiomyopathy: translating cellular cross talk into therapeutics", J. Cell. Biol., (20120000), vol. 199, no. 3, doi:10.1083/jcb.201207033, pages 417 - 421, XP055393511 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.201207033 | - JIANG et al., "Allele-specific silencing of mutant MYH6 transcripts in mice suppresses hypertrophic cardiomyopathy", Science, (20130000), vol. 342, no. 6154, doi:10.1126/science.1236921, pages 111 - 114, XP055393323 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1236921 | - MORKIN, E., "Control of cardiac myosin heavy chain gene expression", Microsc. Res. Tech., (20000000), vol. 50, pages 522 - 531 | - MIYATA et al., "Myosin heavy chain isoform expression in the failing and nonfailing human heart", Circ. Res., (20000000), vol. 86, no. 4, pages 386 - 90 | - HARADA et al., Circulation, (19990000), vol. 100, pages 2093 - 2099 | - MIYATA et al., "Myosin heavy chain isoform expression in the failing and nonfailing human heart", Circ Res., (20000303), vol. 86, no. 4, pages 386 - 90 | - JAMES et al., "Forced expression of alpha-myosin heavy chain in the rabbit ventricle results in cardioprotection under cardiomyopathic conditions", Circulation, (20050000), vol. 111, no. 18, pages 2339 - 2346 | - VAN ROOJI et al., "A family of microRNAs encoded by myosin genes governs myosin expression and muscle performance", Dev. Cell, (20090000), vol. 17, pages 662 - 673 | - LIUOLSON, "MicroRNA regulatory networks in cardiovascular development", Dev. Cell, (20100000), doi:10.1016/J.DEVCEL.2010.03.010, pages 510 - 525, XP002658553 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.DEVCEL.2010.03.010 | - MONTGOMERY et al., Therapeutic inhibition of miR-208a improves cardiac function and survival during heart failure, Circulation, American Heart Association, Inc and Scientific Sessions of the American-Heart-Association/Resuscitation Science Symposium, (20110100), vol. 124, pages 1537 - 1547 | - YEUNG et al., "Myh7b/miR-499 gene expression is transcriptionally regulated by MRFs and Eos", Nucleic Acids Res., (20120000), vol. 40, no. 15, pages 7303 - 18 | - ROSSI et al., "Two novel/ancient myosins in mammalian skeletal muscles: MYH14/7b and MYH15 are expressed in extraocular muscles and muscle spindles", J Physiol., (20100115), vol. 588, pages 353 - 64 | - BELL et al., "Uncoupling of expression of an intronic microRNA and its myosin host gene by exon skipping", Mol. Cell. Biol., vol. 30, pages 1937 - 1945 | - GERALD DORN, II, "MicroRNAs: redefining mechanisms in cardiac disease", J. Cardiovasc. Pharmacol., (20100000), vol. 56, no. 6, pages 589 - 595 | - WANG et al., Bioorganic and Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (19990000), vol. 9, pages 1147 - 1150 | - MCGUIRE et al., "In vitro selection of a peptide with high selectivity for cardiomyocytes in vivo", J. Mol. Bio, (20040000), vol. 342, doi:10.1016/j.jmb.2004.06.029, pages 171 - 182, XP004844899 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2004.06.029 | - MOORE et al., Circulation Research, (20120000), vol. Ill, pages 375 - 385 | - TUERKGOLD, Science, (19900000), vol. 249, pages 505 - 510 | - ELLINGTONSZOSTAK, Nature, (19900000), vol. 346, pages 818 - 822 | - FRANZ et al., Cardioscience, (19940000), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 235 - 43 | - KELLY et al., J. Cell Biol., (19950000), vol. 129, no. 2, pages 383 - 396 | - MOSS et al., Biol. Chem., (19960000), vol. 271, no. 49, pages 31688 - 31694 | - BHAVSAR et al., Genomics, (19960000), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 11 - 23 | - BARNES et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19970000), vol. 272, no. 17, pages 1 1510 - 11517 | - KIMURA et al., Dev. Growth Differ., (19970000), vol. 39, no. 3, pages 257 - 265 | - ZIOBERKRAMER, J. Bio. Chem., (19960000), vol. 271, no. 37, pages 22915 - 22 | - LAPOINTE et al., Hypertension, (19960000), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 715 - 22 | - GOPAL-SRIVASTAVA, J. Mol. Cell. Biol., (19950000), vol. 15, no. 12, pages 7081 - 7090 | - YAMAUCHI-TAKIHARA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, no. 10, pages 3504 - 3508 | - LAPOINTE et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19880000), vol. 263, no. 19, pages 9075 - 9078 | - VAN ROOJI et al., "Control of stress-dependent cardiac growth and gene expression by a microRNA", Science, (20070000), vol. 316, no. 5824, doi:10.1126/science.1139089, pages 1035 - 1038,15701580, XP009108166 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1139089 | - MONTGOMERY et al., "Therapeutic inhibition of miR-208a improves cardiac function and survival during heart failure", Circulation, (20110000), vol. 124, no. 14, doi:10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.111.030932, pages 1537 - 1547, XP002674571 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.111.030932 |