EP3178920 - PAENIBACILLUS POLYMYXA SCHC 33 BACTERIAL STRAIN, AND USE THEREOF TO COMBAT PHYTOPATHOGENIC FUNGI IN FRUITS, VEGETABLES OR PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad De Santiago De Chile Av. Alameda Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins 3363 CP 9170022, Estación Central Santiago / CL | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTIAGO OLMEDO, Roberto Av. Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins 3363 Estación Central Santiago / CL | 02 /
COTTET BUSTAMANTE, Luis Av. Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins 3363 Estación Central Santiago / CL | 03 /
HUILIÑIR CURIO, Cesar Av. Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins 3363 Estación Central Santiago / CL | 04 /
CASTILLO NARA, Antonio Av. Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins 3363 Estación Central Santiago / CL | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Rigamonti, Dorotea Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2017/24] | Application number, filing date | 15830237.2 | 06.08.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015CL50031 | Priority number, date | CL201420142101 | 08.08.2014 Original published format: CL 20142101 | [2017/24] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016019480 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | ES | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3178920 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CL | 11.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, A01N63/00, // C12R1/12 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
A01N63/25 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12R2001/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | C12N1/20, A01N63/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Title | German: | PAENIBACILLUS-POLYMYXA-SCHC-33-BAKTERIENSTAMM UND VERWENDUNG DAVON ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PHYTOPATHOGENEN PILZEN IN OBST, GEMÜSE UND PFLANZEN | [2017/24] | English: | PAENIBACILLUS POLYMYXA SCHC 33 BACTERIAL STRAIN, AND USE THEREOF TO COMBAT PHYTOPATHOGENIC FUNGI IN FRUITS, VEGETABLES OR PLANTS | [2017/24] | French: | SOUCHE BACTÉRIENNE PAENIBACILLUS POLYMYXA SCHC33, ET SON UTILISATION POUR LUTTER CONTRE DES CHAMPIGNONS PHYTOPATHOGÈNES DANS DES FRUITS, LÉGUMES OU PLANTES | [2017/24] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2017 | Translation filed | 28.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 28.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1241247 (C C H S A [BE]) [X] 1,7,11 * the whole document * * page 16 - page 17; table 12 *[I] 2-6,8-10,12-15 | International search | [XY]CN101519639B (RES CT ECO ENVIRONMENTAL SCIEN) [X] 1, 3, 6, 7, 10-12 * Paragraphs 13, 31, 33. * [Y] 2, 4-5, 8-9, 13-16; | [Y]US7935335 (KOCHI SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 8-9, 13-16 * column 12 (Lineas 17-27). *; | [Y] - SHARMA, J.K. et al., "Isolation and identification of proteolytic psychrotrophic sporeforming bacteria from raw milk supplies at an experimental dairy in India .", Journal of the society of Daily technology, (19840700), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 96 - 98, XP 055396767 [Y] 2, 4 * . page 97. * | [Y] - ABIS ENCYCLOPEDY, (20121130), URL: http://www.tgw1916.net/Bacillus/polymyxa.html, (20151202), XP055396769 [Y] 4-5 * the whole document * | [A] - HENRIQUEZ, J.L. et al., "Inhibitory effects of Bacillus amyloliquefasciens and Paenibacillus polymyxa on Botrytis cinerea causing gray rot of grapes.", APS IPPC joint Meeting., (20110806), XP 055397242 [A] 0 * . Abstract * | [A] - LIU, J. et al., "Medium optimization and estructural characterization of exopolysaccharides from endophytic bacterium Paenibacillus polymyxa EJS-3.", Carbohydrate Polymers, (20100000), vol. 79, pages 206 - 2013, XP 026693663 [A] 0 * . doi: 10.1016/j.carbpol.2009.07.055 Page 206. * | [A] - LING, N. et al., "Identification and role of organic acids in watermelon root exidates for recruiting Paenibacillus polymyxa SQR-21 in the rhizosphere.", European Journal of Soil Biology, (20110000), vol. 47, pages 374 - 379, XP 028321066 [A] 0 * . doi: 10.1016/j.ejsoby.2011.08.009 The whole document * |