EP3240904 - PRODUCTION OF CHITIN AND/OR CHITOSAN FROM INSECTS BY MEANS OF ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS, COMPRISING A COMBINATION OF STEPS PERFORMED PRIOR TO THE ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/45] | CHITIN, HYDROLYSATE AND PRODUCTION OF AT LEAST ONE DESIRED PRODUCT FROM INSECTS BY MEANS OF ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS, COMPRISING A COMBINATION OF STEPS PERFORMED PRIOR TO THE ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS | ||
[2019/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ynsect 1 Rue Pierre Fontaine 91058 Évry-Courcouronnes Cedex / FR | [2020/17] |
Former [2017/45] | For all designated states Ynsect 1 Rue Pierre Fontaine 91058 Evry Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEREZINA, Nathalie 3 rue Monge 75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
HUBERT, Antoine 13 chemin Latéral 94140 Alfortville / FR | 03 /
BERRO, Fabrice 15 rue Jean-Jacques Rousseau 75001 Paris / FR | 04 /
LEVON, Jean-Gabriel 102 boulevard Richard Lenoir 75011 Paris / FR | 05 /
LE ROUX, Karine 1 chemin de Chambergeot 91490 Milly La Foret / FR | 06 /
SOCOLSKY, Cecilia 5 rue Blanche 59800 Lille / FR | 07 /
SANCHEZ, Lorena 4 rue Camille Flammarion 91260 Juvisy-sur-Orge / FR | 08 /
LAURENT, Sophie 1 Boulevard Alexandre Millerand Vulcain 1, Apt 147 44200 Nantes / FR | [2020/17] |
Former [2017/45] | 01 /
BEREZINA, Nathalie 3 rue Monge 75005 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
HUBERT, Antoine 13 chemin Latéral 94140 Alfortville / FR | |||
03 /
BERRO, Fabrice 15 rue Jean-Jacques Rousseau 75001 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
LEVON, Jean-Gabriel 102 boulevard Richard Lenoir 75011 Paris / FR | |||
05 /
LE ROUX, Karine 1 chemin de Chambergeot 91490 Milly La Foret / FR | |||
06 /
SOCOLSKY, Cecilia 5 rue Blanche 59800 Lille / FR | |||
07 /
SANCHEZ, Lorena 4 rue Camille Flammarion 91260 Juvisy-sur-orge / FR | |||
08 /
LAURENT, Sophie 1 Boulevard Alexandre Millerand Vulcain 1, Apt 147 44200 NAntes / FR | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/45] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15830826.2 | 30.12.2015 | [2017/45] | WO2015FR53783 | Priority number, date | FR20140063513 | 31.12.2014 Original published format: FR 1463513 | [2017/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016108035 | Date: | 07.07.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3240904 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3240904 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/26, C08B37/08, C12P21/06, C07K14/435 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
C08B37/003 (EP,CN,US);
C08B37/0003 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/43563 (US);
C08L5/08 (EP,US);
C12P19/26 (EP,CN,US);
C12P21/06 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON CHITIN UND/ODER CHITOSAN AUS INSEKTEN DURCH ENZYMATISCHE HYDROLYSE MIT EINER KOMBINATION AUS VOR DER ENZYMATISCHEN HYDROLYSE DURCHGEFÜHRTEN SCHRITTEN | [2019/50] | English: | PRODUCTION OF CHITIN AND/OR CHITOSAN FROM INSECTS BY MEANS OF ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS, COMPRISING A COMBINATION OF STEPS PERFORMED PRIOR TO THE ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS | [2019/50] | French: | PRODUCTION DE CHITINE ET/OU DE CHITOSAN À PARTIR D'INSECTES PAR HYDROLYSE ENZYMATIQUE COMPORTANT UNE COMBINAISON D'ÉTAPES PRÉALABLES | [2019/50] |
Former [2017/45] | CHITIN, HYDROLYSAT UND HERSTELLUNG MINDESTENS EINES GEWÜNSCHTEN PRODUKTS AUS INSEKTEN DURCH ENZYMATISCHE HYDROLYSE MIT EINER KOMBINATION AUS VOR DER ENZYMATISCHEN HYDROLYSE DURCHGEFÜHRTEN SCHRITTEN | ||
Former [2017/45] | CHITIN, HYDROLYSATE AND PRODUCTION OF AT LEAST ONE DESIRED PRODUCT FROM INSECTS BY MEANS OF ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS, COMPRISING A COMBINATION OF STEPS PERFORMED PRIOR TO THE ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS | ||
Former [2017/45] | CHITINE, HYDROLYSAT ET PRODUCTION D'AU MOINS UN PRODUIT D'INTÉRÊT À PARTIR D'INSECTES PAR HYDROLYSE ENZYMATIQUE COMPORTANT UNE COMBINAISON D'ÉTAPES PRÉALABLES | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 20.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2015 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | IE | 30.12.2020 | LU | 30.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 30.12.2015 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MK | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.12.2015 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]CN102558387 ; | [X]US4958011 (BADE MARIA L [US]) [X] 1 * column 13, line 35 - column 15, line 68 *; | [XA]CN1297691 (INST OF ZOOLOGY ACADEMIA SINIC [CN]) [X] 13 * abstract * [A] 3-12,14; | [X]FR2927336 (CIE DES PECHES SAINT MALO SANT [FR]) [X] 2 * abstract *; | [A]CN101775085 (ZHEJIANG PUJIANG CHENGYUE PLAN) [A] 3-14 * abstract *; | [XA]CN101144097B (CHONGQING BAIAODIKE MICROECOLOGICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 13 * abstract * [A] 3-12,14; | [X]WO2012168618 (IFREMER [FR], et al) [X] 1,13 * abstract *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (2012), vol. 2013, no. 01, Database accession no. 2012-M24188, XP002747930 & CN102558387 A 20120711 (QINGDAO ZHONGREN PHARMACY CO LTD) [A] 3-14 * abstract * | [A] - Nitar Nwe ET AL, "Chitin and Chitosan from Terrestrial Organisms", Chitin, Chitosan, Oligosaccharides and Their Derivatives: Biological Activities and Applications, CRC Press, (20101001), pages 3 - 10, ISBN 978-1-4398-1603-5, XP055221223 [A] 3-14 * paragraph [1.2.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1201/EBK1439816035-c1 | [A] - MARÍA CECILIA GORTARI ET AL, "Biotechnological processes for chitin recovery out of crustacean waste: A mini-review", EJB ELECTRONIC JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, CL, (20130515), vol. 16, no. 3, doi:10.2225/vol16-issue3-fulltext-10, ISSN 0717-3458, pages 1 - 18, XP055221276 [A] 3-14 * page 7, paragraph 5 - page 9, paragraph 3; table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2225/vol16-issue3-fulltext-10 | [A] - Wolfram M Brück ET AL, "Chitin and Chitosan from Marine Organisms", Chitin, Chitosan, Oligosaccharides and Their Derivatives: Biological Activities and Applications, CRC Press, (20101001), pages 11 - 23, ISBN 978-1-4398-1603-5, XP055221232 [A] 3-14 * pages 14-19, paragraphs 2.3-2.3.3; figures 2.3, 2.4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1201/EBK1439816035-c2 | [A] - LAILA MANNI ET AL, "An Oxidant- and Solvent-Stable Protease Produced by Bacillus cereus SV1: Application in the Deproteinization of Shrimp Wastes and as a Laundry Detergent Additive", APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, United States, (20100401), vol. 160, no. 8, doi:10.1007/s12010-009-8703-z, ISSN 0273-2289, pages 2308 - 2321, XP055221571 [A] 3-14 * abstract * * page 2317, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12010-009-8703-z | [X] - JUAN WANG ET AL, "Housefly larvae hydrolysate: orthogonal optimization of hydrolysis, antioxidant activity, amino acid composition and functional properties", BMC RESEARCH NOTES, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, GB, (20130517), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1756-0500-6-197, ISSN 1756-0500, page 197, XP021151554 [X] 2 * abstract * * page 7, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph l * * page 2, column r, paragraph 2; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-0500-6-197 | [A] - DAI CHUNHUA ET AL, "Angiotensin I-converting enzyme (ACE) inhibitory peptide derived fromTenebrio molitor(L.) larva protein hydrolysate", EUROPEAN FOOD RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, HEIDELBERG, DE, vol. 236, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S00217-013-1923-Z, ISSN 1438-2377, (20130201), pages 681 - 689, (20130201), XP035311054 [A] 2 * abstract * * page 685, column l, line 3 - column r, paragraph 2 * * page 682, column r, paragraphs 2-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00217-013-1923-z | by applicant | - LOELOVICH, M, J. CHEM, (2014), vol. 3, pages 7 - 14 |