EP3180833 - RESONANT FREQUENCY COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Auckland UniServices Limited Level 10 49 Symonds Street Auckland 1010 / NZ | [2019/15] |
Former [2017/25] | For all designated states Auckland Uniservices Limited Level 10 70 Symonds Street Auckland 1010 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MADAWALA, Udaya Kumara 10 Kauriki Terrace Stonefields Auckland 1072 / NZ | 02 /
THRIMAWITHANA, Duleepa Jayanath 2/241 Marua Road Mt Wellington Auckland 1051 / NZ | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15831747.9 | 11.08.2015 | [2017/25] | WO2015NZ50105 | Priority number, date | NZ20140628544 | 11.08.2014 Original published format: NZ 62854414 | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016024868 | Date: | 18.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3180833 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H01F38/00, H02J5/00, H02J50/00 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
H02J50/12 (EP,KR,US);
H01F38/14 (US);
H02J7/00712 (EP,US);
H02M3/33523 (US);
H02M3/33576 (EP,US);
H02M3/3372 (EP,US);
H03H7/03 (KR);
H03H7/175 (KR);
H02J50/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] | Title | German: | RESONANZFREQUENZKOMPENSIERUNG | [2017/25] | English: | RESONANT FREQUENCY COMPENSATION | [2017/25] | French: | COMPENSATION DE FRÉQUENCE RÉSONANTE | [2017/25] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 31.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 27.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 27.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.2017 | 31.08.2020 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013207482 (MADAWALA UDAYA KUMARA [NZ], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0068] - [0090]; figures 1,2 *; | [X] - ZHAO CHONGWEN ET AL, "Active resonance wireless power transfer system using phase shift control strategy", 2014 IEEE APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION - APEC 2014, IEEE, (20140316), doi:10.1109/APEC.2014.6803480, pages 1336 - 1341, XP032591092 [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [Sections I] - [0III]; figures 2,7,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2014.6803480 | [I] - NEATH MICHAEL J ET AL, "An Optimal PID Controller for a Bidirectional Inductive Power Transfer System Using Multiobjective Genetic Algorithm", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, USA, vol. 29, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TPEL.2013.2262953, ISSN 0885-8993, (20140301), pages 1523 - 1531, (20130920), XP011527636 [I] 1,10,15,16 * column Section; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPEL.2013.2262953 | [X] - ISAAC NAM ET AL, "Novel control approach to achieving efficient wireless battery charging for portable electronic devices", ENERGY CONVERSION CONGRESS AND EXPOSITION (ECCE), 2012 IEEE, IEEE, (20120915), doi:10.1109/ECCE.2012.6342402, ISBN 978-1-4673-0802-1, pages 2482 - 2491, XP032467227 [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [Section II] , [0III] , [0IVB] - [000C]; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECCE.2012.6342402 | International search | [X]WO2012005607 (AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1-17 * See the whole document particularly figures 1-3 & 11-13, page 2, lines 3-6, page 3, lines 1-10, page 5, lines 1-10, page 7- last paragraph, page 8- last paragraph, page 10, page 11- second paragraph, page 15- first paragraph. *; | [X]US2014159500 (SANKAR GANAPATHY [US], et al) [X] 1-17* See the whole document particularly the abstract, figures 1-5, paragraphs [0006], [0008], [0022],[0025], [0027]-[0030]. * |