EP3181206 - SPRING-FORM FLEXIBLE SKATEBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Han, Shin-kyu Jayang Dong E-Ton Tower River 5 Cha B dong 2103 ho 40 Neungdong-ro 4-gil, Gwangjin-gu Seoul 05096 / KR | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jun-hong Koaroo Apts. Ochangjungang-ro 27 309 dong 1106 ho Cheongwon-gu, Ochang-eup Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 28124 / KR | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | [2017/25] | Application number, filing date | 15832044.0 | 05.08.2015 | [2017/25] | WO2015KR08186 | Priority number, date | KR20140105789 | 14.08.2014 Original published format: KR 20140105789 | [2017/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016024751 | Date: | 18.02.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3181206 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A63C17/01, A63C17/00 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
A63C17/0033 (EP,US);
A63C17/011 (US);
A63C17/00 (US);
A63C17/01 (EP,US);
A63C17/016 (US);
A63C2203/40 (EP,US);
B60Y2410/122 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] | Title | German: | GEFEDERTES FLEXIBLES SKATEBOARD | [2017/25] | English: | SPRING-FORM FLEXIBLE SKATEBOARD | [2017/25] | French: | PLANCHE À ROULETTES SOUPLE À RESSORT | [2017/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2017 | Translation filed | 11.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 11.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]KR20060101424 (CHO DONG PYO [KR]) [X] 1 * figures 16,17 * [A] 2,3,5-8 [Y] 4; | [XAY]WO2007117092 (CHO DONG-PYO [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0162] - paragraph [0168]; figures 4,5,9,10,33,34 * [A] 2,3,5-8 [Y] 4; | [Y]KR20090081888 (BAK HUI BOK [KR], et al) [Y] 4* paragraphs [0025] , [0032] , [0033]; figure 7; claim 1 *; | [XAY]WO2009128586 (SLOVIE CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-5 * [A] 6 [Y] 4 | International search | [A]KR200410542Y (LEE, Jung Su) [A] 1-8* See paragraphs [0038][-[0043];and figures 1-2. *; | [YA]KR100622126B (KIM JUN HONG [KR]) [Y] 1,3-5,7 * See claim 2; and figures 1-2, * [A] 2,6,8; | [A]KR20090053408 (JUNG JIN GI [KR]) [A] 1-8 * See paragraphs [0008]-[0009], [0013]-[0019], [0021]-[0022]; and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]KR20090081888 (BAK HUI BOK [KR], et al) [Y] 1, 3-5, 7 * See paragraphs [0021], [0025]; and figures 2, 5, 7. *; | [A]WO2010019627 (RAZOR USA LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * See paragraphs [0059]-[0060], [0088]-[0091], and figures 1-2, 14A-14B. * |