EP3180150 - CUTTING TOOL AND MECHANISM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arbortech Industries Ltd 67 Westchester Road Malaga, W.A. 6090 / AU | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INKSTER, Kevin Ross 67 Westchester Road Malaga Perth, Western Australia 6945 / AU | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Schweiger, Martin Patentanwalt Martin Schweiger Erhardtstraße 12 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Schweiger, Martin Schweiger & Partners Intellectual Property Law Firm Elsenheimer Strasse 1 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15832446.7 | 14.08.2015 | [2017/25] | WO2015AU50465 | Priority number, date | AU20140903193 | 15.08.2014 Original published format: AU 2014903193 | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016023085 | Date: | 18.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3180150 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B23D61/00, B27B19/00, B23D49/00, B23D51/00, B26D1/00, B28D1/06, B23D51/20 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
B28D1/06 (EP,US);
B23D57/00 (US);
B23D49/16 (EP,US);
B23D51/20 (EP,US);
B23D61/006 (US);
B23D61/18 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/25] | B23D61/00, B27B19/00, B23D49/00, B23D51/00, B26D1/00, B28D1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEWERKZEUG UND MECHANISMUS DAFÜR | [2017/25] | English: | CUTTING TOOL AND MECHANISM THEREFOR | [2017/25] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE ET MÉCANISME ASSOCIÉ | [2017/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 13.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1315062 (NEUENBURG H) [X] 1,2,12,13,15 * page 1, lines 9-12,23-44 * * page 1, line 77 - page 2, line 33 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3-5,14,16; | [A]WO2009065187 (ARBORTECH IND LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,16 * figure 7 *; | [XPA]WO2015051418 (ARBORTECH IND LTD [AU]) [XP] 1,2,12-15 * paragraphs [0054] , [0064] - [0069] - [0076] * * figures 19-25 * [A] 3-5; | [AP]EP2886271 (FEIN C & E GMBH [DE]) [AP] 1 * paragraphs [0051] , [0053] , [0054] , [0059] ** figures 3,8b,9 * | International search | DE3543776 [ ]; | [X]US3554197 (DOBBIE ARTHUR KENNETH) [X] 1, 4, 19 [Interpretation A - Refer Box III] * See abstract and figures 1 & 2 *; | [A]US4379362 (GETTS SIDNEY A [US]) [A] 1-20 [Interpretation A - Refer Box III] * See abstract and figures 1-7 *; | DE3543776 [ ] (VNII PK I MECHANIZIROVANNOGO [SU]); | [A]WO2009065187 (ARBORTECH IND LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-20 [Interpretation A - Refer Box III]* See abstract and figures 1-14 * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1986-, & DE3543776 A1 00000000 |