EP3182047 - HEAT EXCHANGE PLATE AND PLATE-TYPE HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danfoss Micro Channel Heat Exchanger (Jiaxing) Co. No. 1383 Xiejia Road Haiyan County Jiaxing City, Zhejiang 314300 / CN | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Wenjian No. 1383 Xiejia Road Haiyan County Jiaxing City Zhejiang 314300 / CN | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 15832506.8 | 29.05.2015 | [2017/25] | WO2015CN80228 | Priority number, date | CN201410395802 | 12.08.2014 Original published format: CN201410395802 | [2017/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016023393 | Date: | 18.02.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3182047 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F28F3/04, F28D9/00 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
F28F3/044 (EP,US);
F28F3/046 (EP,KR,US);
F28F3/048 (US);
F28D9/00 (KR,US);
F28D9/005 (EP,US);
F28F13/08 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] | Title | German: | WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHPLATTE UND WÄRMETAUSCHER VOM PLATTENTYP | [2017/25] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGE PLATE AND PLATE-TYPE HEAT EXCHANGER | [2017/25] | French: | PLAQUE D'ÉCHANGE DE CHALEUR ET ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR DU TYPE PLAQUE | [2017/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2017 | Translation filed | 08.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 08.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004106835 (HALLA CLIMATE CONTROL CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1* figure 20 *; | [XI]US2007006998 (BROST VIKTOR [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-8,11,12 * figures 2,9 * [I] 3,4,10; | [X]DE102012217333 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1a * | International search | [A]CN101158561 (BEIJING JINGHAI HEAT TRANSFER [CN]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]US2011180247 (PERSSON LARS [SE]) [X] 1-8, 11, 12 * description, paragraphs [0035]-[0050], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [X]CN102478368 (DANFOSS AS) [X] 1-8, 11, 12 * description, paragraphs [0037]-[0052], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [X]CN102564176 (DANFOSS AS) [X] 1-8, 11, 12 * description, paragraphs [0034]-[0053], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [PX]CN104132576 (DANFOSS MICRO CHANNEL HEAT EXCHANGER JIAXING CO LTD) [PX] 1-12 * claims 1-12 *; | [PX]CN204255163U (DANFOSS MICROCHANNEL HEAT EXCHANGER JIAXING CO LTD) [PX] 1-12 * claims 1-12 * |