EP3241398 - ADAPTIVE EDCA ADJUSTMENT FOR DYNAMIC SENSITIVITY CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Yan QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
BARRIAC, Gwendolyn Denise QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
MERLIN, Simone QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
CHERIAN, George QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/45] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2017/45] | Application number, filing date | 15832858.3 | 29.12.2015 | [2017/45] | WO2015US67912 | Priority number, date | US201462098253P | 30.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462098253 P | US201514981713 | 28.12.2015 Original published format: US201514981713 | [2017/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016109568 | Date: | 07.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3241398 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/00 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
H04W74/0816 (EP,US);
H04W74/006 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W24/08 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE EDCA-ANPASSUNG ZUR DYNAMISCHEN EMPFINDLICHKEITSSTEUERUNG | [2017/45] | English: | ADAPTIVE EDCA ADJUSTMENT FOR DYNAMIC SENSITIVITY CONTROL | [2017/45] | French: | AJUSTEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME EDCA ADAPTATIF POUR COMMANDE DE SENSIBILITÉ DYNAMIQUE | [2017/45] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 14.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2013279427 (WENTINK MAARTEN MENZO [NL], et al); | [Y]WO2014027847 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [IP]US2015281980 (ZHOU YAN [US], et al) | Examination | US2014126471 |