EP3184693 - PAPER COMPOSITE, PACKAGING MATERIAL AND PRODUCTION METHOD OF PAPER COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/26] | PAPER COMPOSITE, PACKAGING MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PAPER COMPOSITE | ||
[2018/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | For all designated states AGC Inc. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2018/39] |
Former [2017/26] | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | ||
For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAGOE, Masako c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 41 Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 02 /
KUMAKI, Yosuke c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 7471 Tamashimaotoshima Kurashiki-shi Okayama 713-8550 / JP | 03 /
MASUDA, Sho c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 04 /
KAWANA, Junsuke c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 15834070.3 | 19.08.2015 | [2017/26] | WO2015JP73280 | Priority number, date | JP20140167009 | 19.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014167009 | [2017/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016027841 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3184693 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3184693 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/20, B65D65/40, D21H21/14, D21H27/10, D21H21/16 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
D21H19/20 (EP,US);
B65D65/40 (EP,US);
B65D65/42 (US);
D21H17/11 (EP,US);
D21H19/22 (EP,US);
D21H21/14 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/26] | D21H19/20, B65D65/40, D21H21/14, D21H27/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAPIERVERBUNDWERKSTOFF, VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES PAPIERVERBUNDWERKSTOFFS | [2017/26] | English: | PAPER COMPOSITE, PACKAGING MATERIAL AND PRODUCTION METHOD OF PAPER COMPOSITE | [2018/32] | French: | CORPS COMPOSITE DE PAPIER AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI, ET MATÉRIAU D'EMBALLAGE | [2017/26] |
Former [2017/26] | PAPER COMPOSITE, PACKAGING MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PAPER COMPOSITE | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2017 | Translation filed | 09.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 20.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2015 | AL | 26.12.2018 | AT | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | FI | 26.12.2018 | HR | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | MK | 26.12.2018 | MT | 26.12.2018 | NL | 26.12.2018 | PL | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | RS | 26.12.2018 | SE | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | SM | 26.12.2018 | TR | 26.12.2018 | BG | 26.03.2019 | NO | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | PT | 26.04.2019 | GB | 19.08.2019 | IE | 19.08.2019 | LU | 19.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.08.2015 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 19.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.08.2015 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 19.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 19.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 19.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | |
NO | 26.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009035689 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]JP2009102771 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]WO2013160199 (KURARAY EUROPE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO2014098240 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4* claims 1-13 * | International search | [Y]JP2010275647 (OJI PAPER CO, et al) [Y] 1-4 * , claim 1; paragraph [0033]; examples (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2011059039 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * , claims 1, 7; paragraphs [0001], [0080], [0002], [0132]; examples & US 2012/0225300 A1 claims 1, 7; paragraphs [0001], [0002], [0166], [0235]; examples & US 2015/0191874 A1 & EP 2500394 A1 & CN 102666772 A & KR 10-2012-0103585 A *; | [A]WO2013115196 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4* , claim 1; examples & US 2014/0343207 A1 claim 1; examples & EP 2810966 A1 & CN 104093757 A *; | [PA]JP2014234556 (KURARAY CO) [PA] 1-4 * , claims & WO 2014/192931 A1 * |