EP3223746 - METHOD FOR THE QUANTITATIVE PREDICTION OF THE DATE OF BIRTH OF LIVESTOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leibniz-Institut für Nutztierbiologie Wilhelm Stahlallee 2 18196 Dummerstorf / DE | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANTEUFFEL, Christian An der Zarnow 12 18196 Damm/OT Reez / DE | 02 /
SCHÖN, Christian Min Hüsung 12 18190 Sanitz / DE | 03 /
HOFFMANN, Gundula Glienickerstrasse 58 14612 Falkensee / DE | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Grünbaum, Annekathrin Schnick & Garrels Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schonenfahrerstraße 7 18057 Rostock / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Kietzmann, Manfred Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrichstrasse 95 IHZ P.O. Box 4 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 15834665.0 | 20.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015DE00554 | Priority number, date | DE20141017435 | 25.11.2014 Original published format: DE102014017435 | [2017/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016082815 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3223746 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61D17/00 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
A61D17/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR QUATITATIVEN VORHERSAGE VON GEBURTSTERMINEN BEI NUTZTIEREN | [2017/40] | English: | METHOD FOR THE QUANTITATIVE PREDICTION OF THE DATE OF BIRTH OF LIVESTOCK | [2017/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION QUANTITATIVE DE DATE DE MISE BAS POUR DES ANIMAUX DE RENTE | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 23.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/12] | 14.11.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2437250 (ITI SCOTLAND LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3* page 8, line 22 - page 9, line 19 *; | [X]WO2009074153 (SKOV AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 9 * * page 5, lines 6-12 * * page 6, lines 4-25 * * claims 1, 2 *; | [X]US2010331739 (MALTZ EPHRAIM [IL], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 16] * | by applicant | DE202005017618U | DE102006044037 | WO2013186232 | US2014073879 | DE102013221591 | - "Predicting farrowing based on accelerometcr data", PASTELL, HIETAOJA; YUN, TIUSANEN; VALROS, Precision Livestock Farming |