EP3149254 - A SYSTEM TO MOUNT CEILING TILES IN A COMPLETELY CONCEALED GRID SYSTEM WHERE INDIVIDUAL TILE CAN BE MOUNTED OR DISMOUNTED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vangala, Pattabhi 1-3-183/40/70/4 Gandhinagar Hyderabad 500 080 Telangana State / IN | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 15834766.6 | 11.11.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015IN00417 | Priority number, date | IN2015CHE3919 | 30.07.2015 Original published format: IN 3919CH2015 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017017690 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3149254 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/22 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
E04B9/225 (EP,US);
E04B9/067 (US);
E04B9/127 (US);
E04B9/28 (US);
E04B9/003 (EP,US);
E04B9/247 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR MONTAGE VON DECKENPLATTEN IN EINEM VOLLSTÄNDIG VERDECKTEN GITTERSYSTEM, IN DEM EINE EINZELNE PLATTE MONTIERT ODER DEMONTIERT WERDEN KANN | [2017/14] | English: | A SYSTEM TO MOUNT CEILING TILES IN A COMPLETELY CONCEALED GRID SYSTEM WHERE INDIVIDUAL TILE CAN BE MOUNTED OR DISMOUNTED | [2017/14] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MONTAGE DE DALLES DE PLAFOND DANS UN SYSTÈME DE GRILLE ENTIÈREMENT DISSIMULÉ OÙ DES DALLES INDIVIDUELLES PEUVENT ÊTRE MONTÉES OU DÉMONTÉES | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 19.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/31] | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB856716 (DENIS MARK BEADLE) [X] 1,5 * page 2, line 3 - line 126; figures 1,2 * [I] 2-4,6,7; | [A]GB494240 (BERT INKLEY) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2937664 (COFIM [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR3011021 (VICENTE ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | US5024034 | by applicant | US5428930 | US4648229 | US3832816 | US8056294 |