EP3187498 - AZAINDOLE DERIVATIVE HAVING AMPK-ACTIVATING EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shionogi & Co., Ltd. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMURA, Yuusuke c/o Shionogi & Co. Ltd. 1-1 Futabacho 3-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0825 / JP | 02 /
HINATA, Yu c/o Shionogi & Co. Ltd. 1-1 Futabacho 3-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0825 / JP | 03 /
KOJIMA, Eiichi c/o Shionogi & Co. Ltd. 1-1 Futabacho 3-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0825 / JP | 04 /
OZASA, Hiroki c/o Shionogi & Co. Ltd. 1-1 Futabacho 3-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0825 / JP | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/27] | Application number, filing date | 15836882.9 | 26.08.2015 | [2017/27] | WO2015JP73947 | Priority number, date | JP20140172192 | 27.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014172192 | JP20150009894 | 22.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015009894 | JP20150072597 | 31.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015072597 | [2017/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016031842 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3187498 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61K31/444, A61K31/5377, A61P3/04, A61P3/06, A61P3/10, A61P9/12, A61P43/00, C07D519/00 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/437 (EP,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/03 (EP,US);
A61K31/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61K31/444 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D519/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Extension states | BA | 27.03.2017 | ME | 27.03.2017 | Title | German: | AZAINDOLDERIVAT MIT AMPK-AKTIVIERENDER WIRKUNG | [2017/27] | English: | AZAINDOLE DERIVATIVE HAVING AMPK-ACTIVATING EFFECT | [2017/27] | French: | DÉRIVÉ D'AZAINDOLE AYANT UN EFFET D'ACTIVATION DE L'AMPK | [2017/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2017 | Translation filed | 27.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 04.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 17.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2011511008 (Mercury Therapeutics, Inc.) [A] 1-26* , a whole document & JP 2014-28828 A & JP 5525456 B & US 2010/0009992 A1 & US 2012/0302576 A1 & WO 2009/100130 A1 & EP 2240016 A1 & AU 2009212462 A & CA 2714181 A & KR 10-2010-0115789 A & CN 101959404 A & IL 207234 D & MX 2010008376 A & EA 201001257 A & NZ 587165 A *; | [A]WO2012033149 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * , a whole document & JP 5641663 B & JP 2015-13876 A & US 2013/0184240 A1 & EP 2617722 A1 & AU 2011299894 A & CA 2811025 A & CN 103209981 A & MX 2013002558 A & KR 10-2013-0139910 A & RU 2013115924 A & TW 201217372 A *; | [A]WO2013011932 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * , a whole document & US 2014/0194420 A1 & EP 2733141 A1 & AU 2012284955 A & CA 2841906 A & CN 103781786 A & KR 10-2014-0040801 A & MX 2014000452 A *; | [A]JP2013504537 (Glaxo SmithKline L.L.C.) [A] 1-26 * , a whole document & JP 2013-504537 A & US 2012/0172333 A1 & WO 2011/029855 A1 & EP 2475660 A1 *; | [A]WO2014069426 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [A] 1-26 * , a whole document (Family: none) *; | [PX]WO2014133008 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [PX] 1-26 * , a whole document & US 2015/0203450 A1 *; | [PX]WO2014139388 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [PX] 1-26 * , a whole document (particularly, examples 68, 69) (Family: none) * |