EP3186039 - A LIGHTING MAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knight, Ratu PO Box 832 Kensington NSW 1465 / AU | [2018/44] |
Former [2017/27] | For all designated states Knight, Ratu 919/2 Ascot Avenue Zetland, New South Wales 2017 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2017/27] | Application number, filing date | 15837068.4 | 28.08.2015 | [2017/27] | WO2015AU50502 | Priority number, date | AU20140903432 | 29.08.2014 Original published format: AU 2014903432 | [2017/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016029271 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3186039 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B25H5/00, F21V33/00 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
F21V33/00 (EP,US);
B25H5/00 (EP,US);
F21V31/04 (EP,US);
F21Y2105/10 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Extension states | BA | 24.03.2017 | ME | 24.03.2017 | Title | German: | LICHTMATTE | [2017/27] | English: | A LIGHTING MAT | [2017/27] | French: | TAPIS À ÉCLAIRAGE | [2017/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 24.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006057531 (KIM SEAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-6,9-11,13-15 * pages 15-19; figure - * [I] 7,12; | [XYI]US7670026 (HAWKINS VICTOR JONATHAN [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,13-15 * columns 4-9; figure -; claim - * [Y] 5,9 [I] 4; | [XYI]CA2176330 (CASTLE PETER L [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,12-15 * pages 3,4,6,7; figure -; claim - * [Y] 5,6 [I] 11; | [XY]US2009126139 (BATTI STEPHEN A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,13-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0042]; figure - * [Y] 5,6,9; | [XY]US2011310595 (HARDESTY GARY [US]) [X] 1-4,9-11 * paragraphs [0015] - [0027]; figure - * [Y] 5,6; | [XY]US6718576 (SHIH JEN HSIEH [TW]) [X] 1-4,6,12,15 * the whole document * [Y] 9; | [XY]US8206002 (OLSON TIMOTHY ANDREW [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * columns 2,3; figure - * [Y] 4-6,9; | [Y]US2012326404 (ROW RICK [US]) [Y] 4-6,9 * paragraphs [0018] - [0028]; figure - *; | [Y]US5419945 (LOPEZ GABRIEL A [US]) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2011310595 (HARDESTY GARY [US]) [X] 1-5, 8, 11-13 * Paras 15-21, figs. 1-6 *; | [X]US8206002 (OLSON TIMOTHY ANDREW [US]) [X] 1-3, 8-10, 18 * Figs. 1-3, col. 2, lines 55-67, col.3, line 1-12 *; | [X]US6718576 (SHIH JEN HSIEH [TW]) [X] 1-8, 14, 17-18 * figs 1-12 and col.2, lines 36-65, *; | [X]WO2006057531 (KIM SEAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-3, 6-7, 8-13, 15-16, 18 * page 16, lines 10-15, Page 18, line 8, figs. 2-7 * |