EP3190738 - SIGNAL TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING CARRIER AGGREGATION, AND DEVICE FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Seungmin IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
SEO, Hanbyul IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Byounghoon IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
AHN, Joonkui IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2024/31] |
Former [2017/28] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15837683.0 | 01.09.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015KR09182 | Priority number, date | US201462044408P | 01.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462044408 P | [2017/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016036103 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3190738 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3190738 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L1/18, H04W72/0446, H04W72/20 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (KR);
H04L5/003 (CN);
H04W72/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/1607 (CN);
H04L1/18 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (CN,KR);
H04L1/1861 (US);
H04L5/00 (US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (EP,US);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04W72/1273 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/16] | H04L5/00, H04L1/18, H04W72/14, H04W72/12 | ||
Former IPC [2017/28] | H04L5/00, H04L1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGS- UND -EMPFANGSVERFAHREN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT TRÄGERAGGREGATIONSUNTERSTÜTZUNG UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2017/28] | English: | SIGNAL TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING CARRIER AGGREGATION, AND DEVICE FOR SAME | [2017/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL PRENANT EN CHARGE UNE AGRÉGATION DE PORTEUSES, ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2017 | Translation filed | 20.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 20.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013137677 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | International search | [Y]US2012230273 (HE HONG [CN], et al); | [Y]US2013208634 (JI HYOUNGJU [KR], et al); |