EP3189834 - USE OF GABAA RECEPTOR REINFORCING AGENT IN PREPARATION OF SEDATIVE AND ANESTHETIC MEDICAMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haisco Innovative Pharmaceutical PTE. LTD. 478 Geylang Road Singapore 389437 / SG | [2021/22] |
Former [2017/28] | For all designated states Sichuan Haisco Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industrial Development Park Wenjiang District, Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MO, Yi No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | 02 /
LI, Fangqiong No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Jianyu No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | 04 /
YU, Yan No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | 05 /
LI, Honghu No. 136 Beverly Road Wenjiang District, Chengdu City Sichuan Province / CN | 06 /
MU, Hong No. 136 Beverly Road Wenjiang District, Chengdu City Sichuan Province / CN | 07 /
ZHANG, Yuquan No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | 08 /
YU, Qingyang No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | 09 /
CHENG, Fujun No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | 10 /
YAN, Pangke No. 136 Beverly Road Wenjiang District, Chengdu City Sichuan Province / CN | 11 /
ZHAO, Ziwei No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | 12 /
QIN, Linlin No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | [2017/31] |
Former [2017/28] | 01 /
MO, Yi No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | ||
02 /
LI, Fangqiong No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | |||
03 /
LIU, Jianyu No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | |||
04 /
YU, Yan No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | |||
05 /
LI, Honghu No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | |||
06 /
MU, Hong No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | |||
07 /
ZHANG, Yuquan No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | |||
08 /
YU, Qingyang No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | |||
09 /
CHENG, Fujun No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | |||
10 /
YAN, Pangke No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | |||
11 /
ZHAO, Ziwei No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | |||
12 /
QIN, Linlin No. 136 Beverly Road Across the Taiwan Strait Technology Industry Development Park Wenjiang District Chengdu City Sichuan Province 611130 / CN | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15837862.0 | 28.08.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015CN88341 | Priority number, date | CN201410449571 | 04.09.2014 Original published format: CN201410449571 | CN201410449723 | 04.09.2014 Original published format: CN201410449723 | [2017/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016034079 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3189834 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3189834 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/05, A61K45/06, A61K9/00, A61K9/08, A61K9/107, A61K9/19, A61P23/00, A61P25/20, A61P25/22, A61P25/24, A61P25/06, A61P25/18, A61P1/08, A61P25/08, A61K47/26, A61K47/44, A61K47/10 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/05 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61J1/18 (EA,US);
A61K31/661 (EA,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,EA,US);
A61K47/02 (EA,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,EA,US);
A61K47/12 (EA,US);
A61K47/14 (EA,US);
A61K47/18 (EA,US);
A61K47/183 (EA,US);
A61K47/24 (EA,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,EA,US);
A61K47/44 (EP,EA,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K9/107 (EP,EA,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61P1/08 (EP,EA,US);
A61P25/06 (EP,EA,US);
A61P25/08 (EP,EA,US);
A61P25/18 (EP,EA,US);
A61P25/20 (EP,EA,US);
A61P25/22 (EP,EA,US);
A61P25/24 (EP,EA,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/28] | A61K31/05, A61K31/661, C07C39/17, C07F9/12, A61K9/08, A61K9/107, A61K9/19, A61P23/00, A61P25/20, A61P25/22, A61P25/24, A61P25/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON GABAA-REZEPTORVERSTÄRKUNGSMITTEL BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON BERUHIGUNGS- UND ANÄSTHESIEMEDIKAMENTEN | [2017/28] | English: | USE OF GABAA RECEPTOR REINFORCING AGENT IN PREPARATION OF SEDATIVE AND ANESTHETIC MEDICAMENT | [2017/28] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN AGENT STIMULANT LE RÉCEPTEUR GABAA DANS LE CADRE DE LA PRÉPARATION D'UN MÉDICAMENT SÉDATIF ET ANESTHÉSIQUE | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2017 | Translation filed | 31.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 31.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 03.04.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2024 | BG | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 17.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2995604 (SICHUAN HAISCO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN]); | International search | [A]CN101199480 (XIAN LIBANG MEDICINE SCIENCE A [CN]); | [A]WO2009140275 (PHARMACOFORE INC [US], et al); | [PX]WO2014180305 (SICHUAN HAISCO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN]) |