EP3189341 - FERROMAGNETIC AUGMENTATION FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyperfine, Inc. 530 Old Whitfield Street Guilford, CT 06437 / US | [2021/34] |
Former [2017/28] | For all designated states Hyperfine Research Inc. 530 Old Whitfield Street Guilford, CT 06437 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POOLE, Michael Stephen 130 Old Sachems Head Road Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 02 /
REARICK, Todd 5 Wyndemere Court Cheshire, CT 06410 / US | 03 /
ROTHBERG, Jonathan M. 215 Uncas Point Road Guilford, CT 06437 / US | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/28] | Application number, filing date | 15838192.1 | 04.09.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015US48515 | Priority number, date | US201462046814P | 05.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462046814 P | US201562110049P | 30.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562110049 P | US201562111320P | 03.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562111320 P | US201562174666P | 12.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562174666 P | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016037042 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3189341 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/381, G01R33/383, G01R33/38, G01R33/34, G01R33/422, G01R33/3875 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
G01R33/28 (EP,IL,US);
G01R33/3804 (EP,IL,US);
G01R33/445 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01R33/5608 (IL,KR,US);
G01R33/34007 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01R33/36 (IL,US);
G01R33/3614 (IL,US);
G01R33/38 (IL,US);
G01R33/3802 (EP,IL,US);
G01R33/3806 (EP,IL,US);
G01R33/381 (EP,IL,US);
G01R33/383 (IL,US);
G01R33/385 (IL,US);
G01R33/3852 (IL,US);
G01R33/3854 (IL,KR,US);
G01R33/3856 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01R33/3858 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01R33/3875 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01R33/422 (IL,KR,US);
G01R33/48 (IL,KR,US);
G01R33/543 (IL,KR,US);
G01R33/546 (IL,US);
G01R33/56 (IL,US);
G01R33/56518 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/28] | G01R33/381, G01R33/383 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Title | German: | FERROMAGNETISCHE AUGMENTATION FÜR MAGNETRESONANZABBILDUNG | [2017/28] | English: | FERROMAGNETIC AUGMENTATION FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING | [2017/28] | French: | AUGMENTATION FERROMAGNÉTIQUE POUR IMAGERIE PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 23.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5252924 (SAKURAI HIDEYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9 * column 2, lines 21-29; figure 9 *; | [XI]US6411187 (ROTEM HAIM [IL], et al) [X] 1-8,10,12-14 * column 22, line 59 - column 24, line 14; figures 13-20 * * column 27, line 26 - column 30, line 27 * * column 31, line 55 - column 32, line 2 * * column 56, line 20 - column 57, line 27 * * column 22, line 30 - line 37; claims 1, 51-53 * [I] 9,11,15; | [X]US2011025332 (ABELE MANLIO [US], et al) [X] 1,6-9* paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0080]; figures 2-7 * | International search | [A]US2012268117 (ROMANO ROCCO [IT], et al) [A] 8-31, 35-37 * ; paragraphs [0086, 0088-0089] *; | [A]US8451004 (WALSH DAVID O [US]) [A] 1-37* ; entire document *; | [XA]WO2014013257 (UNIV ABERDEEN [GB]) [X] 1-7, 32-34 * ; figure 2; paragraphs [0039-0050] * [A] 8-31 |