EP3188734 - METHOD OF TREATING ORGANOPHOSPHATE INTOXICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Texas A&M University System 3369 Tamu College Station Bryan, Texas 77843-3369 / US | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REDDY, Doodipala, Samba 2481 Newark Circle College Station, TX 77845 / US | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | McNab, Donald C., et al Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | McNab, Donald C. Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15838694.6 | 01.09.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015US47914 | Priority number, date | US201462044635P | 02.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462044635 P | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016036724 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3188734 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/56, A61K31/565, A61K31/57, A61K31/573, A61P25/00, A61P25/28 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
A61K31/57 (EP,US);
A61K31/565 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/28] | A61K31/56, A61K9/48, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Extension states | BA | 21.03.2017 | ME | 21.03.2017 | Validation states | MA | 21.03.2017 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER ORGANOPHOSPHATVERGIFTUNG | [2017/28] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING ORGANOPHOSPHATE INTOXICATION | [2017/28] | French: | MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE L'INTOXICATION PAR ORGANOPHOSPHATES | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 21.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/20] | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - LUMLEY L A ET AL, "Anticonvulsant and neuroprotectiveeffects of the neurosteroidpregnanolone against soman exposure in rats", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER 2008, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER 2008, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER 2008, (20080101), vol. 38, XP009502080 [X] 1-4,7,9,11,12,14,15 * abstract * [I] 5,6,8,10,13 | [XI] - SCHWARTZ J E ET AL, "Soman-induced seizures and brain pathology are reduced in rats by the neurosteroidallopregnanolone administered in combination with diazepam", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER 2010, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER 2010, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER 2010, (20100101), vol. 40, XP009502079 [X] 1-4,7,9,11,12,14,15 * abstract * [I] 5,6,8,10,13 | [XI] - SHARMA AMIT K ET AL, "Effect of progesterone on phosphamidon-induced impairment of memory and oxidative stress in rats", HUMAN & EXPERIMENTAL TOXICOLOGY, SAGE PUBLICATIONS LTD, GB, (20110930), vol. 30, no. 10, doi:10.1177/0960327110396522 PUBMED:21257640, ISSN 1477-0903, pages 1626 - 1634, XP009502077 [X] 1-4,9,11,12,14,15 * abstract * * page 1627 * [I] 5-8,10,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0960327110396522 pubmed:21257640 | International search | [XY]WO2014028398 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1, 3, 9, 11-19, 56, 58, 64, 66-73, 75, 77, 81-92 * ; paragraphs [0007], [0009]-[0010], [0037], [0040], [0044]-[0045], [0052], [0055]-[0056], [0066], [0131]-[0132]; claims 1, 8, 20-21, 47 * [Y] 4-8, 10, 20, 22-39, 41-55, 57, 59-63, 65, 74, 78-80; | [XY]WO2013043985 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 75-76 * ; paragraphs [0011], [0037]; claims 1, 3, 19-21 * [Y] 20-21, 39-40; | [Y]WO2014100231 (KOTZKER CONSULTING LLC [US]) [Y] 7-8, 26-27, 62-63 * ; page 5, line 21; page 6, lines 1-2, line 9, lines 24-26 *; | [Y]US8604066 (BAUD FREDERIC J [FR], et al) [Y] 20-38, 42-43, 57 * ; column 5, lines 50-51; claims 1, 8 *; | [Y]US5521215 (KLOOG YOEL [IL], et al) [Y] 39-41, 44-55, 74 * ; column 3, lines 26-32; column 6, lines 21-29 *; | [Y] - LALLEMENT, G, "Medical management of organophosphate-induced seizures.", Journal of Physiology, Paris)., (19980000), vol. 92, pages 369 - 373, XP055416548 [Y] 4-6, 23-25, 42-44, 59-61, 78-80 * ; abstract; page 372, right column, 5th paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0928-4257(99)80007-2 | [Y] - VENKATESH, S, "Progression of Type I to Type II paralysis in acute organophosphorous poisoning: Is oxidative stress significant?;", Archives of Toxicology., (20060000), vol. 80, doi:doi:10.1007/s00204-005-0053-1, pages 354 - 361, XP 019419722 [Y] 10, 29, 65 * ; abstract * | [Y] - EDDLESTON, M, "Management of acute organophosphorus pesticide poisoning.", LANCET., (20080000), vol. 371, pages 597 - 607, XP022482851 [Y] 6, 25, 44, 61, 80 * ; page 600, summary of treatment * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(07)61202-1 | [Y] - FLOWER, O et al., "Sedation in Traumatic Brain Injury.", Emergency Medicine International., vol. 2012, no. 637171, pages 1 - 12, XP055416552 [Y] 45 * ; page 1, right column, 2nd paragraph; page 4, left column, last paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2012/637171 | [Y] - INSTITUTE OF MEDICINE., "Veterans and Agent Orange.", The National Academies., (19960000), URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/books/NBK232842/pdf/Bookshelf_NBK232842.pdf, (20151022), XP055416557 [Y] 47 * ; page 304, 2nd paragraph; page 310, 4th paragraph * |