EP3196230 - POWDER COMPRISING HYDROLYZABLE RESIN PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd. 18-1 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8627 / JP | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Seishi c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings Ltd. Corporate Research&Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Toshiki c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings Ltd. Corporate Research&Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 03 /
KATAYAMA, Tsutaki c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings Ltd. Corporate Research&Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15839330.6 | 11.08.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015JP72727 | Priority number, date | JP20140183305 | 09.09.2014 Original published format: JP 2014183305 | [2017/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016039061 | Date: | 17.03.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3196230 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/12, C08L101/16, E21B43/16, C09K8/22 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
C08J3/12 (EP,RU,US);
C08K5/11 (US);
C08L101/16 (EP,RU,US);
C08L67/04 (US);
C09K8/035 (EP,US);
C09K8/5086 (EP,US);
C09K8/516 (EP,US);
C09K8/68 (EP,US);
C09K8/70 (EP,US);
C09K8/885 (EP,US);
C09K8/92 (EP,US);
C08J2300/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/30] | C08J3/12, C08L101/16, E21B43/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | PULVER MIT HYDROLYSIERBAREN HARZPARTIKELN | [2017/30] | English: | POWDER COMPRISING HYDROLYZABLE RESIN PARTICLES | [2017/30] | French: | POUDRE COMPRENANT DES PARTICULES DE RÉSINE HYDROLYSABLE | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2017 | Translation filed | 27.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 27.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0834019 (MITSUBISHI CHEM MKV CO); | [A]JP2007231154 (SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS); | [X]JP2009185227 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]JP2010126619 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]WO2012105140 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [A]JP2013136732 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP); | [A]WO2014112479 (KUREHA CORP [JP]) |