EP3191218 - ON-BOARD CO2 CAPTURE AND STORAGE WITH METAL ORGANIC FRAMEWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King Abdullah University of Science and Technology 4700 King Abdullah University Of Science and Technology Bldg. 16, Room 4518 Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | [2017/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDDAOUDI, Mohamed 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | 02 /
BELMABKHOUT, Youssef 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | 03 /
SHEKHAH, Osama 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | [2017/29] | Representative(s) | Goulard, Sophie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2017/29] | Application number, filing date | 15839684.6 | 11.09.2015 | [2017/29] | WO2015US49683 | Priority number, date | US201462049331P | 11.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462049331 P | [2017/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016040799 | Date: | 17.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3191218 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3191218 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/22, B01D53/02, F01N3/08, F01N3/022 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
B01J20/226 (EP,US);
F01N3/0821 (US);
B01D53/02 (US);
F01N3/022 (US);
F01N3/0857 (US);
B01D2253/204 (US);
B01D2253/306 (US);
B01D2257/504 (US);
F01N2310/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/29] | B01J20/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BORDEIGENE CO2-ERFASSUNG UND -SPEICHERUNG MIT METALLORGANISCHEM GERÜST | [2017/29] | English: | ON-BOARD CO2 CAPTURE AND STORAGE WITH METAL ORGANIC FRAMEWORK | [2017/29] | French: | CAPTURE ET STOCKAGE DE CO2 EMBARQUÉ À STRUCTURE ORGANOMÉTALLIQUE | [2017/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 10.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2015 | AL | 08.05.2019 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | IE | 11.09.2019 | LU | 11.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 11.09.2015 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.09.2015 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 11.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2007068389 (YAGHI OMAR M [US]) [Y] 1,3-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0032]; figures 3A, 3B * [A] 2,9-15; | [A]GB2437063 (UNI I OSLO [NO]) [A] 1-15* page 4, paragraph fourth; claims 4,6 *; | [XAY] - PATRICK NUGENT ET AL, "Porous materials with optimal adsorption thermodynamics and kinetics for CO2 separation", NATURE, (20130227), vol. 495, no. 7439, doi:10.1038/nature11893, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 80 - 84, XP055209186 [X] 9,11-15 * abstract * * page 80, column right * * page 81; table 1 * [A] 2,10 [Y] 1,3-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11893 | [XY] - PATRICK NUGENT ET AL, "Porous materials with optimal adsorption thermodynamics and kinetics for CO2 separation - SUPPLEMENTARY INFORMATION", NATURE, (20130227), vol. 495, no. 7439, doi:10.1038/nature11893, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 80 - 84, XP055209263 [X] 9,11-15 * Section: "4- Column Breakthrough Test Set-up, Procedure and Measurements:"; Scheme S3; page 8 * [Y] 1,3-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11893 | International search | [A]WO2013112792 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013298761 (HAMAD ESAM ZAKI [SA]) [Y] 1-16 * entire document *; | [PA]US2015093299 (SCHNAARS KURT KEITH [US]) [PA] 1-16* entire document *; | [PA]US2015158013 (EDDAOUDI MOHAMED [US], et al) [PA] 1-16 * entire document *; | [Y] - WANG et al., "C02 capture by solid adsorbents and their applications: current status and new trends.", Energy Environ. Sci., vol. 4, (20110000), pages 42 - 55, URL: http://www.researchgate.net/profile/Ziyi_Zhong/publication/255748610_Co2_capture_by_solid_adsorbents_and_their_applications_current_status_and_new_trends/links/0046353a91a8773a43000000.pdf, (20151026), XP055417084 [Y] 1-16 * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C0EE00064G | [Y] - SHEKHAH et al., "Made-to-order metal-organic frameworks for trace carbon dioxide removal and air capture.", Nat. Commun., vol. 5, (20140625), page 4228, URL: http://www.nature.com/ncomms/2014/140625/ncomms5228/pdf/ncomms5228.pdf, (20151026), XP055209187 [Y] 1-16 * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms5228 | [A] - MILLWARD et al., "Metal-Organic Frameworks with Exceptionally High Capacity for Storage of Carbon Dioxide at Room Temperature.", J. Am. Chem. Soc., vol. 127, no. 51, doi:doi:10.1021/ja0570032, (20050000), pages 17998 - 17999, URL: http://pubs.acs.org/doi/abs/10.1021/ja0570032, (20151027), XP007904150 [A] 1-16 * . see abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0570032 | [A] - NUGENT et al., "Porous materials with optimal adsorption thermodynamics and kinetics for C02 separation.", Nature, vol. 495, doi:doi:10.1038/nature11893, (20130307), pages 80 - 84, URL: http://sqma.myweb.usf.edu/pages/pictures/publications/P_65.pdf, (20151026), XP055209186 [A] 1-16 * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11893 |