EP3193862 - TOPICAL CANNABINOID COMPOSITION FOR TREATING ARTHRITIC PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/30] | CANNABINOID COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING PAIN | ||
[2023/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IGC PHARMA IP, LLC 10224 Falls Road Potomac, MD 20854 / US | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/52] | For all designated states India Globalization Capital, Inc. 10224 Falls Road Potomac, MD 20854 / US | ||
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states India Globalization Capital Inc. 4336 Montgomery Avenue Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUKUNDA, Ramachandra 8909 Tuckerman Lane Potomac, MD 20854 / US | 02 /
KRISHNA, Ranga Chelva 330 Thornton Road Englewood, NJ 07631 / US | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/42] | Script IP Limited Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | ||
Former [2017/30] | McQueen, Andrew Peter Miltons IP - Europe 5th Floor, Broad Quay House Prince Street Bristol BS1 4DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15841994.5 | 16.09.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015US50342 | Priority number, date | US201462050864P | 16.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462050864 P | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016044370 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3193862 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3193862 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/05, A61K31/352, A61K31/714, A61P25/00, A61P25/02, A61P19/02 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/714 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/05 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,IL,US);
A61K36/185 (IL,US);
A61K47/44 (IL,US);
A61K9/0014 (IL,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/714, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2018/20] | A61K31/352, A61K31/714, A61P25/00, A61P25/02 | ||
Former IPC [2017/30] | A61K31/352 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOPISCHE CANNABINOID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG ARTHRITISCHER SCHMERZEN | [2023/17] | English: | TOPICAL CANNABINOID COMPOSITION FOR TREATING ARTHRITIC PAIN | [2023/17] | French: | COMPOSITION TOPIQUE DE CANNABINOÏDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR ARTHRITIQUE | [2023/17] |
Former [2017/30] | CANNABINOIDVERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHMERZEN | ||
Former [2017/30] | CANNABINOID COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING PAIN | ||
Former [2017/30] | COMPOSITION CANNABINOÏDE ET MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 15.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.03.2023 | 20.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 19.01.2024 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004138293 (WERNER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 1, paragraphs 1,3,4 * * pages 3, 4; claims 1-6 *; | [Y] - Anonymous, "Vitamin B12- Essential for Chronic Pain Management", (20140509), URL: http://blog.vitasciences.com/chronic-pain/vitamin-b12-essential-for-chronic-pain-management/, (20180404), XP055464506 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2004138293 (WERNER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * entire document *; | [Y]US6949582 (WALLACE WALTER H [US]) [Y] 6, 15, 16 * entire document *; | [Y]US2010035978 (GUY GEOFFREY [GB], et al) [Y] 7* entire document *; | [Y]US2011217278 (FELDER MITCHELL S [US]) [Y] 1-16 * entire document * |