EP3195182 - SECURE SMARTCARD READER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERIFONE, INC. 88 West Plumeria Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2021/39] |
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states VERIFONE, INC. 88 West Plumeria Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANKO, Igal Yosef 5356 Wesley Road Rocklin, California 95765 / US | 02 /
MCKIBBEN, Scott William 720 Hunt Way Davis, California 95616 / US | 03 /
BARROWMAN, John Henry 1907 Cascade Falls Lane Knoxville, Tennessee 37931 / US | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15842040.6 | 25.08.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015IL50851 | Priority number, date | US201462050866P | 16.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462050866 P | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016042543 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3195182 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3195182 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
G06F21/83 (EP,US);
H01H13/7065 (EP,CN,US);
G06K7/065 (US);
G06F21/86 (EP,US);
G06F3/0202 (CN);
G06K19/07 (US);
G06K7/0013 (EP,US);
G06K7/0021 (US);
H01H13/78 (CN);
H01H13/86 (CN);
H01H2201/026 (EP,US);
H01H2203/038 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERER CHIPKARTENLESER | [2017/30] | English: | SECURE SMARTCARD READER | [2017/30] | French: | LECTEUR DE CARTE À PUCE SÉCURISÉ | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 13.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2015 | AL | 29.09.2021 | AT | 29.09.2021 | CY | 29.09.2021 | CZ | 29.09.2021 | DK | 29.09.2021 | EE | 29.09.2021 | ES | 29.09.2021 | FI | 29.09.2021 | HR | 29.09.2021 | IT | 29.09.2021 | LT | 29.09.2021 | LV | 29.09.2021 | MC | 29.09.2021 | MK | 29.09.2021 | MT | 29.09.2021 | NL | 29.09.2021 | PL | 29.09.2021 | RO | 29.09.2021 | RS | 29.09.2021 | SE | 29.09.2021 | SI | 29.09.2021 | SK | 29.09.2021 | SM | 29.09.2021 | BG | 29.12.2021 | NO | 29.12.2021 | GR | 30.12.2021 | IS | 29.01.2022 | PT | 31.01.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 25.08.2015 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
MK | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 25.08.2015 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.08.2015 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
NO | 29.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007095910 (GALLAGHER NIALL [CA], et al); | [Y]US2008121706 (DEFIBAUGH GEORGE RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]US2008164320 (GARRIDO-GADEA ENRIQUE [GB], et al); | [Y]US2009042433 (BUSHBY DONALD P [US]); | [Y]US2013298252 (RIBEIRO-PEREIRA JORGE [BR]) |