EP3200180 - AMOLED PIXEL UNIT AND DRIVING METHOD THEREFOR, AND AMOLED DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kunshan New Flat Panel Display Technology Center Co. Ltd No. 320 Fu Chun River Road Photoelectric Industrial Park Development Zone KunShan City, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | For all designated states Kunshan Go-Visionox Opto-Electronics Co., Ltd. Building 4 No. 1 Longteng Road Development Zone KunShan City, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Nan No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone KunShan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Hui No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone KunShan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 03 /
HU, Siming No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone KunShan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 04 /
HUANG, Xiuqi No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone KunShan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB, et al Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15844547.8 | 23.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015CN90361 | Priority number, date | CN201410508539 | 28.09.2014 Original published format: CN201410508539 | [2017/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016045590 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3200180 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3200180 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32, G09G3/3233 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3225 (US);
G09G3/3266 (US);
G09G3/3275 (US);
H10K59/12 (US);
H10K59/131 (EP,KR);
G09G2300/0439 (US);
G09G2300/08 (US);
G09G2300/0819 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0842 (KR);
G09G2300/0861 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0251 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0262 (EP,US);
G09G2310/08 (KR);
G09G2320/0214 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2017/31] | G09G3/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMOLED-PIXELEINHEIT UND ANSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE AMOLED-ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2017/31] | English: | AMOLED PIXEL UNIT AND DRIVING METHOD THEREFOR, AND AMOLED DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2017/31] | French: | UNITÉ DE PIXEL À AMOLED ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PILOTAGE, ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE À AMOLED | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2017 | Translation filed | 25.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 25.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2010220093 (CHOI SANG-MOO [KR]); | [XA]US2011157126 (CHUNG BO-YONG [KR], et al); | [XI]US2014175992 (YANG SHENGJI [CN]) | International search | [A]US2006145967 (HUH JIN [KR]); | [A]JP2009265328 (TOSHIBA MOBILE DISPLAY CO LTD); | [X]CN102903333 (KUNSHAN NEW FLAT PANEL DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY CT CO LTD); | [X]CN103000134 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD); | [X]CN103035195 (WINTEK CORP) | Examination | JP2009258227 |