EP3199637 - ELECTROCHEMICAL MEASURING METHOD AND ELECTROCHEMICAL MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAMOTO, Kaoru c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
YASUMI, Masahiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
USHIO, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
SHUNORI, Atsushi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2017/31] | Application number, filing date | 15845383.7 | 17.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015JP04752 | Priority number, date | US201462055185P | 25.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462055185 P | JP20150065869 | 27.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015065869 | [2017/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016047114 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3199637 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/02, G01N27/416, C12M1/34, C12M1/42, G01N33/483 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
C12Q1/02 (EP,US);
G01N27/416 (EP,US);
G01N33/4833 (EP,US);
C12M1/34 (US);
C12M1/42 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/31] | C12Q1/02, G01N27/416, C12M1/34, C12M1/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN MESSUNG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN MESSUNG | [2017/31] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL MEASURING METHOD AND ELECTROCHEMICAL MEASURING DEVICE | [2017/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2016 | Translation filed | 22.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 22.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/49] | 18.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010055942 (CLINO CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y] - MICHAELA NEBEL ET AL, "Microelectrochemical visualization of oxygen consumption of single living cells", FARADAY DISCUSSIONS, GB, (20130101), vol. 164, doi:10.1039/c3fd00011g, ISSN 1359-6640, page 19, XP055400278 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3fd00011g | [A] - YASUMOTO DATE ET AL, "Monitoring oxygen consumption of single mouse embryos using an integrated electrochemical microdevice", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 30, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BIOS.2011.08.037, ISSN 0956-5663, (20110826), pages 100 - 106, (20110906), XP028334470 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2011.08.037 | International search | [Y]WO2004092369 (RIKEN [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * , claims 1, 15; page 14, lines 1 to 18 & JP 4530991 B & US 2007/0087436 A1 paraqraphs [0087] to [0090] *; | [A]JP2007108171 (LIFESCAN INC) [A] 1-15* , & US 2007/0074977 A1 & EP 1770396 A2 & CN 1975403 A *; | [Y]WO2010055942 (CLINO CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * , claims; examples 2, 4; fig. 2 & JP 2010-121948 A *; | [A]JP2010527440 (Tecella LLC) [A] 1-15 * , 2 & US 2008/0296175 A1 & WO 2008/137716 A2 & EP 2153224 A2 *; | [A]WO2010137266 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , & JP 2013-156270 A & US 2012/0028282 A1 & EP 2405264 A1 & CN 102414558 A & KR 10-2012-0068760 A *; | [A]JP2014110780 (PANASONIC HEALTHCARE CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , (Family: none) * |