EP3203751 - CONTENT RECEPTION DEVICE, CONTENT RECEPTION SYSTEM, CONTENT RECEPTION DEVICE CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOBARA, Kunio c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2017/32] | Application number, filing date | 15845941.2 | 01.10.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015JP04996 | Priority number, date | JP20140205251 | 03.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014205251 | JP20150030074 | 18.02.2015 Original published format: JP 2015030074 | [2017/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016051804 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3203751 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/431, H04N21/436, H04N21/482 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
H04N21/440236 (EP,US);
H04N21/431 (US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/8153 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | INHALTSEMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG, INHALTSEMPFANGSSYSTEM, INHALTSEMPFANGSVORRICHTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2017/32] | English: | CONTENT RECEPTION DEVICE, CONTENT RECEPTION SYSTEM, CONTENT RECEPTION DEVICE CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2017/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION DE CONTENU, SYSTÈME DE RÉCEPTION DE CONTENU, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION DE CONTENU ET PROGRAMME | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2016 | Translation filed | 16.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 16.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005066126 (SAITO KAORU) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US2006051055 (OHKAWA KENICHI [JP]) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [A]US2006064716 (SULL SANGHOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO2007105876 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US2008209491 (HASEK CHARLES A [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US2011134325 (AHN KYUTAE [KR]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2000116606 (ACCESS KK, et al) [Y] 5 * , paragraph [0018] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2006253960 (DAIKIN IND LTD, et al) [Y] 9* , paragraphs [0211] to [0215]; fig. 29, 30 (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2012231538 (OPENTV INC) [X] 1-4, 6-8, 10, 11 * , paragraphs [0019], [0020], [0035] to [0037]; fig. 1, 2, 6 & US 2014/0245357 A1 paragraphs [0029], [0030], [0044]; fig. 1, 2, 6 & WO 2008/030565 A2 & EP 2062127 A * [Y] 5, 9 |