EP3202546 - CERAMIC HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AND HONEYCOMB MOLDING MOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proterial, Ltd. 6-36, Toyosu 5-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0061 / JP | [2023/17] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-70, Konan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8224 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAZAKI, Shunji c/o Hitachi Metals Ltd. 35 Nagahama-cho Kandamachi Miyako-gun Fukuoka 800-0393 / JP | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Diehl & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 9 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15846063.4 | 30.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015JP77878 | Priority number, date | JP20140201888 | 30.09.2014 Original published format: JP 2014201888 | [2017/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016052680 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3202546 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B28B3/26, B28B3/20, B01D46/24 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
B01D46/2498 (EP,US);
B28B3/269 (EP,US);
B01D39/2068 (US);
B28B3/20 (EP,US);
B28B3/26 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (US);
B01D2279/30 (US);
B01D46/2482 (EP,US);
B01D46/2486 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6021 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/32] | B28B3/26, B28B3/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | KERAMISCHE WABENSTRUKTUR, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND WABENFORMWERKZEUG | [2017/32] | English: | CERAMIC HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AND HONEYCOMB MOLDING MOLD | [2017/32] | French: | STRUCTURE EN NID-D'ABEILLES EN CÉRAMIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION S'Y RAPPORTANT ET MOULE DE MOULAGE DE NID-D'ABEILLE | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2017 | Translation filed | 24.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 24.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2005007218 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0034] * * figures 5,7, * [I] 10; | [AD]JP2008155594 (DENSO CORP) [AD] 11 * figure 6 ** paragraph [0042] *; | [XI]EP1977810 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * figures 1(b), 2-4 * * paragraph [0079] * [I] 3; | WO2008126335 [ ] (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [ ] * the whole document *; | [XI]EP2368618 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8 * paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0146] * * paragraph [0152] * * figures 9, 10 * * paragraph [0154] * [I] 3,7; | [I]JP2012170935 (DENSO CORP) [I] 5,9-11 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039]; figures 5-7 * | International search | [A]JP2002283327 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [A] 1-11* , entire text & US 2002/0185776 A1 entire text & DE 10213587 A & BE 1014926 A *; | [YA]JP2004001365 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraph [0031]; fig. 3 & US 2005/0255288 A1 paragraph [0067]; fig. 3 & WO 2003/091182 A1 & AU 2003236101 A * [A] 5-11; | [YA]WO2008126335 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * , claims; paragraphs [0052], [0067] to [0068], [0075] to [0076]; fig. 2, 3 & US 2008/0236394 A1 claims; paragraphs [0123] to [0124], [0167] to [0169], [0180] to [0182]; fig. 6, 7 & EP 1977810 A1 & CN 101421016 A & KR 10-2009-0087407 A * [A] 5-11 |