EP3201672 - SELECTIVE PLANE ILLUMINATION MICROSCOPY (SPIM) SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Bo 246 Yerba Buena Ave San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | 02 /
MCGORTY, Ryan 3140 1st Ave. San Diego, CA 92103 / US | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15846370.3 | 02.10.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015US53656 | Priority number, date | US201462058882P | 02.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462058882 P | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016054474 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3201672 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/16, G01N21/64, G02B5/06, G02B21/04, G02B21/24, G02B21/36, G02B21/00, G02B21/06 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
G02B21/0088 (EP,US);
B01L3/5027 (US);
B01L3/502761 (EP,US);
G01N21/6458 (EP,US);
G02B21/04 (US);
G02B21/06 (US);
G02B21/16 (EP,US);
G02B21/24 (EP,US);
G02B21/362 (US);
G02B21/367 (EP,US);
G02B5/06 (EP,US);
B01F25/4331 (EP,US);
B01F33/30 (EP,US);
B01F35/81 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0694 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/32] | G02B21/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR MIKROSKOPIE MIT BELEUCHTUNG SELEKTIVER EBENEN (SPIM) | [2017/32] | English: | SELECTIVE PLANE ILLUMINATION MICROSCOPY (SPIM) SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2017/32] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE MICROSCOPIE À ÉCLAIRAGE DE PLAN SÉLECTIVE (SPIM) | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 13.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/24] | 18.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4953956 (CARPENTER DAVID J [US]) [X] 10 * column 3, lines 39,40; figure 1 * * column 4, lines 5,6 * [I] 11,12; | [XPA]WO2015004107 (ZEISS CARL MICROSCOPY GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-4,6,8-10,13,14 * page 9, paragraph 5 * * page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 4 * * figure 1 * [A] 5,7,11,12,15; | [XPA]WO2015036589 (JOHANN WOLFGANG GOETHE UNIVERSITÄT [DE]) [XP] 1-4,7-10,13,14 * page 6, paragraph 5 * * page 19, paragraph 3; figures 5,6,9 * [A] 5,6,11,12,15; | [XPA]WO2014180884 (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY LAB EMBL [DE]) [XP] 1,3,5,8-11,15 * paragraph [0027]; figures 2,3 * [A] 2,4,6,7,12,14 | International search | [YA]US5982534 (PINKEL DANIEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 12-15, 18-20 * , entire document, especially; FIG 1, FIG 2, col 6, In 58 to col 8, In 50 * [A] 5-11, 16, 17; | [YA]US4717239 (STEENBLIK RICHARD A [US]) [Y] 1-4, 12-15, 18-20 * , entire document, especially; col 2, In 7-13, col 9, In 38-62 * [A] 5-11, 16, 7; | [Y]US2013100272 (PRICE JEFFREY H [US], et al) [Y] 2 * , entire document, especially; para [0003], [0100] *; | [Y]US2009174937 (HOLY TIMOTHY E [US], et al) [Y] 12 * entire document, especially; para [0020] *; | [A]US2005264877 (MANDELLA MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document * |