EP3202868 - DOUBLE-SIDED ADHESIVE TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0047 / JP | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIDA, Noriyuki c/o Sekisui Chemical Co. Ltd. 510-5 Azasuwa Oazashide Taga-cho Inukami-gun Shiga 522-0314 / JP | 02 /
IWAI, Yuki c/o Sekisui Chemical Co. Ltd. 510-5 Azasuwa Oazashide Taga-cho Inukami-gun Shiga 522-0314 / JP | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15846820.7 | 28.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015JP77307 | Priority number, date | JP20140199394 | 29.09.2014 Original published format: JP 2014199394 | [2017/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016052399 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3202868 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/24, C09J7/26 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
C09J7/241 (EP);
C09J7/20 (EP);
C09J7/26 (EP);
C09J2301/124 (EP);
C09J2400/243 (EP);
C09J2423/00 (EP);
C09J2433/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/32] | C09J7/02, C09J133/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | DOPPELSEITIGES KLEBEBAND | [2017/32] | English: | DOUBLE-SIDED ADHESIVE TAPE | [2017/32] | French: | RUBAN ADHÉSIF DOUBLE FACE | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2017 | Translation filed | 20.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 20.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011300361 (NAKAYAMA NAOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* paragraphs [0004] , [0150] - [0151] - [0166] - [0167] * | International search | [YA]JP2009084367 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [Y] 4 * , paragraph [0002] (Family: none) * [A] 1-3; | [XY]JP2013053179 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * , claims; paragraphs [0014], [0018] to [0019], [0036] to [0038]; examples (Family: none) * [Y] 4; | [XA]WO2013141167 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 1-3 * , comparative example 4 (Family: none) * [A] 4; | [XY]JP2013213104 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * , claims; paragraphs [0011], [0013], [0015] to [0016], [0036] to [0038]; examples (Family: none) * [Y] 4; | [PXA]JP2014185310 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [PX] 1-3 * , claims; paragraphs [0016] to [0017], [0023], [0071], [0073]; examples (Family: none) * [PA] 4; | [PXA]WO2015046526 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * , claims; paragraphs [0009] to [0012], [0033] to [0035]; examples & TW 201520248 A *[PA] 4 |