EP3200892 - ACOUSTOPHORETIC CLARIFICATION OF PARTICLE-LADEN NON-FLOWING FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flodesign Sonics, Inc. 11 Interstate Drive, Suite 200 West Springfield, MA 01089 / US | [2022/17] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states Flodesign Sonics Inc. 380 Main Street Wilbraham, MA 01095 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIPKENS, Bart 380 Main Street Wilbraham, Massachusetts 01095 / US | 02 /
KING, Jeff 380 Main Street Wilbraham, Massachusetts 01095 / US | 03 /
SOKOLOWSKI, David 380 Main Street Wilbraham, Massachusetts 01095 / US | 04 /
MASI, Anthony B. 380 Main Street Wilbraham, Massachusetts 01095 / US | 05 /
KENNEDY, Brian T. 380 Main Street Wilbraham, Massachusetts 01095 / US | 06 /
MCCARTHY, Brian 380 Main Street Wilbraham, Massachusetts 01095 / US | 07 /
ROSS-JOHNSRUD, Benjamin 380 Main Street Wilbraham, Massachusetts 01095 / US | 08 /
DIONNE, Jason 499 Bushy Hill Road Simsbury, Connecticut 06070 / US | 09 /
MEALEY, Dane 380 Main Street Wilbraham, Massachusetts 01095 / US | 10 /
BARNES, Jason 380 Main Street Wilbraham, Massachusetts 01095 / US | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/32] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15847217.5 | 30.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015US53200 | Priority number, date | US201462057514P | 30.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462057514 P | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016054192 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3200892 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3200892 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D17/00, B01D21/28, B01D43/00, C02F1/36 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
B01D21/283 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3678 (EP,US);
B01D17/044 (EP,US);
B01D17/06 (EP,US);
B01D19/0078 (EP,US);
B06B1/0622 (KR,US);
B06B1/0644 (KR,US);
C12M47/04 (EP,KR,US);
C12N13/00 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2221/10 (EP,US);
B01D51/08 (EP,US);
B06B1/06 (EP,US);
B06B2201/71 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKUSTOPHORETISCHE KLÄRUNG PARTIKELBEHAFTETER STRÖMUNGSLOSER FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2017/32] | English: | ACOUSTOPHORETIC CLARIFICATION OF PARTICLE-LADEN NON-FLOWING FLUIDS | [2017/32] | French: | CLARIFICATION ACOUSTOPHORÉTIQUE DE FLUIDES SANS ÉCOULEMENT ET CHARGÉS EN PARTICULES | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 23.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2015 | AL | 03.08.2022 | AT | 03.08.2022 | CY | 03.08.2022 | CZ | 03.08.2022 | DK | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | ES | 03.08.2022 | FI | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | IT | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | MC | 03.08.2022 | MK | 03.08.2022 | NL | 03.08.2022 | PL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | RS | 03.08.2022 | SE | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | TR | 03.08.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | IE | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | LU | 30.09.2022 | NO | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 30.09.2015 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
MK | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 30.09.2015 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 30.09.2015 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.09.2015 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5006266 (SCHRAM CORNELIUS J [GB]) [X] 1,4,9-11 * col. 2, l. 41-48; col. 4, l. 62-68; col. 6, l. 44 - col. 7, l. 18; col. 9, l. 41 - col. 10, l. 5.;; figures 8,9 *; | [XY]US5225089 (BENES EWALD [AT], et al) [X] 1-3,6-12 * col. 5, l. 23-25; col. 6, l. 44-59; col. 7. l. 26-32; col. 9, l. 25-30; col. 10, l. 23 and l. 30-32; col. 10, l. 34-37; col. 15, l. 21-23; col. 15, l. 37-41; col. 16, l. 14; col. 18, l. 1-18;;; figures 11, 12; claim 1 * [Y] 13,14; | [A]WO9743026 (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB], et al) [A] 7,11 * p. 2, l. 31- p. 3, l. 2 and p. 8 and p. 10, l. 8-12 and p. 18, l. 2-10;; figure 5 *; | [A]EP1200789 (VARRIN ROBERT D JR [US]) [A] 7* paragraphs [0008] , [0 19] *; | [X]US2007138108 (HADFIELD DAVID [GB], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 28] , [0 29] , [0 31] , [0 32]; figures 1, 2 *; | [XY]WO2014124306 (FLODESIGN SONICS INC [US]) [X] 1,4,5,9,10 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 69] , [0 52] , [0 45] , [0 88]; figures 5, 3; claims 4, 11,12 * [Y] 13,14 | International search | [A]WO9817373 (UNIV CARDIFF [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * , Fig. 1, pg. 4, ln. 8-38 *; | [A]US2007053795 (LAUGHARN JAMES A JR [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , Fig. 1, para [0034] *; | [Y]US2007267351 (ROACH ROBERT LANDON [IL], et al) [Y] 10 * , Fig. 3, para [0064] *; | [A]US2008264716 (KUIPER STEIN [NL], et al) [A] 1, 20 * , Figs. 1-2, para [0023][0030] *; | [Y]US2014011240 (LIPKENS BART [US], et al) [Y] 3-5 and 17-19 * , para [0083], [0147] *; | [A]US2014102947 (BAYM MICHAEL H [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , Fig. 10, para [0056]-[0062] *; | [XY]US2014141413 (LAUGHAM JR JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 6-9, 11-16 and 20 * , Fig. 1, para [0020]-[0022] * [Y] 3-5, 10 and 17-19 | Examination | US6030463 | by applicant | US5006266 | US5225089 | WO9743026 | US6030463 | WO0106196 | US2007138108 | WO2014124306 | - ILINSKII, "Acoustic Radiation Force on a Sphere in Tissue", The Journal of the Acoustical Society of America, (20120000), vol. 132, no. 3, page 1954 |