EP3202909 - CANCER SPECIFIC-SPLICING RIBOZYME AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RZNOMICS INC. Room 314, 152, Jukjeon-ro Suji-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states Industry-Academic Cooperation Foundation Dankook University Dankook Univ. Jukjeon-dong 152 Jukjeon-ro Suji-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 448-701 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Seong Wook 121-602 16 Hwarang-ro 48-gil Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-761 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Ju Hyun 2-701 1102 Gyeongsu-daero Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 440-851 / KR | 03 /
JEONG, Jin Sook 208-1904 113 Bunpo-ro Nam-gu Busan 608-784 / KR | 04 /
HAN, Sang Young 104-602 15 Daecheon-ro 67beon-gil Haeundae-gu Busan 612-791 / KR | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2017/32] | Application number, filing date | 15847264.7 | 23.07.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015KR07694 | Priority number, date | KR20140130286 | 29.09.2014 Original published format: KR 20140130286 | KR20140185976 | 22.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140185976 | [2017/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016052851 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3202909 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3202909 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/85, C12N9/22, A61K31/713, A61K38/43, A61P35/00 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/713 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/113 (KR,US);
A61K38/43 (EP,US);
A61K48/0058 (US);
A61K48/0066 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/4705 (US);
C12N15/1135 (EP,US);
C12N15/63 (US);
C12N15/79 (US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/01 (US);
C07K2319/33 (US);
C07K2319/61 (US);
C12N2310/113 (EP,US);
C12N2310/12 (US);
C12N2310/124 (EP,US);
C12N2310/128 (US);
C12N2330/51 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10343 (EP,US);
C12N2830/008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREBSSPEZIFISCHES SPLICING-RIBOZYM UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2017/32] | English: | CANCER SPECIFIC-SPLICING RIBOZYME AND USE THEREOF | [2017/32] | French: | RIBOZYME À ÉPISSAGE SPÉCIFIQUE DU CANCER, ET SON UTILISATION | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2017 | Translation filed | 27.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 27.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2015 | AL | 26.06.2019 | AT | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | ES | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | IT | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | NL | 26.06.2019 | PL | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | RS | 26.06.2019 | SE | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | SM | 26.06.2019 | TR | 26.06.2019 | IE | 23.07.2019 | LU | 23.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 23.07.2015 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 23.07.2019 | ||
LU | 23.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 23.07.2015 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 23.07.2019 | ||
LU | 23.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 23.07.2019 | ||
LU | 23.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 23.07.2019 | ||
LU | 23.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 23.07.2019 | ||
LU | 23.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 23.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - JEONG, JIN SOOK, ET AL., "Highly specific and effective HCC gene therapy based on cancer-specific RNA replacement via liver-specific microRNA regulation in mouse model.", HEPATHOLOGY, (20121001), vol. 56, no. Suppl.1, ISSN 0270-9139, page 793A, XP002779800 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - KIM JU-HYUN ET AL, "ANTI- CANCER APPROACH THROUGH MICRORNA-REGULATED RNA REPLACEMENT", NUCLEIC ACID THERAPEU, MARY ANN LIEBERT, INC. PUBLISHERS, US, (20111001), vol. 21, no. 5, ISSN 2159-3337, page A17, XP009183471 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - JEONG JIN SOOK ET AL, "In vivo HCC Gene therapy targeting by trans-splicing ribozyme and liver specific promoter with augumented safety", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR MEDICINE, & 18TH WORLD CONGRESS ON ADVANCES IN ONCOLOGY / 16TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MOLECULAR MEDICINE; CRETE, GREECE; OCTOBER 10 -12, 2013, (2013), vol. 32, no. Suppl. 1, page S12, XP002779801 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - XINPING FU ET AL, "Construction of an Oncolytic Herpes Simplex Virus That Precisely Targets Hepatocellular Carcinoma Cells", MOLECULAR THERAPY : THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF GENE THERAPY, US, (20120201), vol. 20, no. 2, doi:10.1038/mt.2011.265, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 339 - 346, XP055465038 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2011.265 | [A] - WON ET AL, "Targeted retardation of hepatocarcinoma cells by specific replacement of alpha-fetoprotein RNA", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070419), vol. 129, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JBIOTEC.2007.02.004, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 614 - 619, XP022034272 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2007.02.004 | [XP] - JUHYUN KIM ET AL, "Targeted Regression of Hepatocellular Carcinoma by Cancer-Specific RNA Replacement through MicroRNA Regulation", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20150720), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/srep12315, page 12315, XP055275537 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep12315 | [XP] - JEONG JIN-SOOK ET AL, "Efficient and Safe HCC-specific Gene Therapy and Its Possible Role of Immunogenic Cell Death via Adenovirus Harboring mTERT-targeting Trans-splicing Ribozyme, Liver-specific Promoter and MicroRNA Regulation in Immunocompetent Mouse", HEPATOLOGY, & 65TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-ASSOCIATION-FOR-THE-STUDY-OF-LIVER-DISEASES; BOSTON, MA, USA; NOVEMBER 07 -11, 2014, (2014), vol. 60, no. Suppl. 1, Sp. Iss. SI, page 827A, XP002779802 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [XP] - KIM JU-HYUN ET AL, "Development of cancer gene therapy based on cancer-specific RNA replacement through microRNA regulation", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, & ESGCT AND NVGCT COLLABORATIVE CONGRESS; THE HAGUE, NETHERLANDS; OCTOBER 23 -26, 2014, (201411), vol. 25, no. 11, pages A80 - A81, XP002779803 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20100024055 (IND ACADEMIC COOP [KR]) [A] 1-14* See abstract *; | [Y]KR20120132594 (INDUSTRY-ACADEMIC COOPERATION FOUNDATION, DANKOOK UNIVERSITY) [Y] 1-14 * See the entire document, especially abstract; the claims; paragraph [0018] etc. *; | [Y] - LIM, JI YEONG, "Studies on the Improvement of Efficacy of Trans-Splicing Ribozyme for Cancer Therapy based on Group I Intron of Tetrahymena Thermophila", Master's Thesis of Graduate School of Dankook University, (20120000) [Y] 1-14 * See the entire document * | [YA] - KWON, B-S. et al., "Specific Regression of Human Cancer Cells by Ribozyme-Mediated Targeted Replacement of Tumor-Specific Transcript", Molecular Therapy, (20051100), vol. 12, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ymthe.2005.06.096, pages 824 - 834, XP005126644 [Y] 2, 12-14 * See the entire document * [A] 1, 3-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymthe.2005.06.096 | [YA] - "Herpes simplex virus type 1 thymidine kinase and 3KBL genes", GenBan k, (19930802), Database accession no. J02224.1 [Y] 9, 12-14 * See the entire document * [A] 1-8, 10, 11 |