EP3202738 - LAMINATED GLASS INTERMEDIATE FILM AND LAMINATED GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0047 / JP | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Kazuhiko c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 1259 Izumi, Minakuchicho Koka-shi, Shiga 528-8585 / JP | 02 /
OOTA, Yuusuke c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 1259 Izumi, Minakuchicho Koka-shi, Shiga 528-8585 / JP | 03 /
KITANO, Hirofumi c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 1259 Izumi, Minakuchicho Koka-shi, Shiga 528-8585 / JP | 04 /
INUI, Hiroaki c/o SEKISUI S-LEC B.V. Metaalweg 5 NL-6045 JB Roermond / NL | [2023/22] |
Former [2017/32] | 01 /
NAKAYAMA Kazuhiko c/o Sekisui Chemical Co. Ltd. 1259 Izumi Minakuchicho Koka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
OOTA Yuusuke c/o Sekisui Chemical Co. Ltd. 1259 Izumi Minakuchicho Koka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
KITANO Hirofumi c/o Sekisui Chemical Co. Ltd. 1259 Izumi Minakuchicho Koka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | |||
04 /
INUI Hiroaki c/o SEKISUI S-LEC B.V. Metaalweg 5 NL-6045 JB Roermond / NL | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2023/42] |
Former [2017/32] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15847828.9 | 30.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015JP77858 | Priority number, date | JP20140202340 | 30.09.2014 Original published format: JP 2014202340 | [2017/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016052668 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3202738 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3202738 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, B32B7/022, B32B7/027 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
B32B17/10036 (EP,KR,US);
B32B3/30 (KR,RU,US);
B32B17/10587 (EP,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B32B7/02 (US);
B32B7/022 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B32B7/027 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B32B7/06 (KR);
B60J1/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2017/32] | C03C27/12, B32B17/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWISCHENFOLIE FÜR VERBUNDGLAS SOWIE VERBUNDGLAS | [2017/32] | English: | LAMINATED GLASS INTERMEDIATE FILM AND LAMINATED GLASS | [2017/32] | French: | FILM INTERMÉDIAIRE DE VERRE FEUILLETÉ ET VERRE FEUILLETÉ | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2017 | Translation filed | 16.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 16.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 19.01.2024 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5455103 (HOAGLAND JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 1-6* column 3, lines 5-38 *; | [X]US6093471 (HOPFE HAROLD H [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * figure - * * claim 1 * * example 1 * * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 45 *; | [A]JP2002102846 (JIYOPURATSUKUSU KK) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004191482 (NAKAJIMA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] , [0020] , [0038] , [0042] , [0044] , [0099] , [0110] , [0113] , [0140] , [0155] *; | [E]EP3202729 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-6 * examples 14,16-18,20,21 *; | [E]EP3205632 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-6 * tables 2,3 *; | [E]EP3281926 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-6 * examples 4,19,21,27,29,33 * | International search | [A]JPS60208241 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , page 2, lower right column, lines 17 to 19 (Family: none) *; | [X]JPH09295839 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * , claims; paragraphs [0009], [0013], [0017], [0032] to [0054]; table 1, example 1; table 2, example 4; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2001130931 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , claims; paragraph [0017] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2003128442 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , claims; examples 3, 6, 9; fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2003212614 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , claims; example 5 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2014021459 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6* , claims; fig. 2 & US 2015/0174862 A1 claims; fig. 2 & EP 2881376 A1 & KR 10-2015-0054755 A * |