EP3205045 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TESTING AND VALIDATION OF CRYPTOGRAPHIC ALGORITHMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corsec Security, Inc. 13135 Lee Jackson Memorial Highway Suite 220 Fairfax, Virginia 22033 / US | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
APPLER, Matthew Alan 3589 Plum Dale Drive Fairfax, Virginia 22033 / US | 02 /
MORRIS, John Robert 1719 N. Monroe Street Arlington, Virginia 22207 / US | 03 /
RABE, Elizabeth Meyers 6117 Roxbury Avenue Springfield, Virginia 22152 / US | 04 /
HOLMES, David Patrick 7201 Harrison Lane 201 Alexandria, Virginia 22306 / US | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 15848345.3 | 02.10.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015US53689 | Priority number, date | US201414509106 | 08.10.2014 Original published format: US201414509106 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016057325 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205045 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, H04L12/26, G06F21/57, G06F21/60, H04L29/06 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
G06F21/577 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (IL,US);
G06F21/602 (EP,US);
H04L43/50 (IL);
H04L63/1433 (EP,IL,US);
H04L9/00 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | H04L9/00, H04L12/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR PRÜFUNG UND VALIDIERUNG VON KRYPTOGRAFISCHEN ALGORITHMEN | [2017/33] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TESTING AND VALIDATION OF CRYPTOGRAPHIC ALGORITHMS | [2017/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE CONTRÔLER ET DE VALIDER DES ALGORITHMES CRYPTOGRAPHIQUES | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 10.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 24.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1001569 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0059]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2004223607 (GRIFFIN DANIEL C [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 0046 * * column 0058 - column 0210; figures 3,5 * * column 0261 *; | [A] - "Implementation Guidance for FIPS PUB 140-1 and the Cryptographic Module Validation Program", SECURITY REQUIREMENTS FOR CRYPTOGRAPHIC MODULES, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY COMMUNICATIONS SECURITY ESTABLISHMENT, US, (20020110), vol. FIPS PUB 140-1, pages 1 - 56, XP009501741 [A] 1-19 * column 4.11 - column 4.11.2 * | International search | [A]US2004223607 (GRIFFIN DANIEL C [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0046], [0072]-[0074], [0176]-[0201]; and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US6965673 (BONEH DAN [US], et al) [A] 1-37* See column 15, line 27 - column 17, line 4; and figure 7. *; | [A]US2009119503 (ISAAKIAN EMIL A [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0059]; and figures 2-5. *; | [A]US2011055649 (KOUSHANFAR FARINAZ [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0057]; and figures 5, 6. *; | [A] - "Implementation Guidance for FIPS PUB 140-1 and the Cryptographic Module Validation Program", National Institute of Standards and Technology Communications Security Establishment, (20020110), XP009501741 [A] 1-37 * See pages 5-22. * |