EP3206246 - ELECTROLYTE FILM FOR FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.L. Gore & Associates, Co., Ltd. 1-8-15 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/49] |
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states W.L. Gore & Associates, Co., Ltd. 1-8-15 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARUYAMA, Masashi c/o W. L. Gore & Associates Co. Ltd. 1-8-15 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
YANO, Yoshikazu c/o W. L. Gore & Associates Co. Ltd. 1-8-15 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Takeyuki c/o W. L. Gore & Associates Co. Ltd. 1-8-15 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
TAKANE, Tomoyuki c/o W. L. Gore & Associates Co. Ltd. 1-8-15 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2017/33] | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15848372.7 | 29.09.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015JP77550 | Priority number, date | JP20140209384 | 10.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014209384 | [2017/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016056430 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3206246 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3206246 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/10, H01M8/103, H01M8/1044, H01M8/1051, H01M8/106, H01M8/1062, H01M8/1067, C01G55/00, C08F14/26, H01M8/1018, H01M8/1039, H01M8/1081 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
H01M8/1044 (EP,KR,US);
C08F14/26 (US);
H01M8/103 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/1051 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/1058 (KR);
H01M8/106 (EP,US);
H01M8/1067 (EP,US);
H01M8/1079 (US);
C01G55/00 (US);
C08F2500/21 (US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYTFILM FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2017/33] | English: | ELECTROLYTE FILM FOR FUEL CELL | [2017/33] | French: | FILM ÉLECTROLYTIQUE POUR PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2017 | Translation filed | 04.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 04.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2015 | AL | 04.12.2019 | AT | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | ES | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | IT | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | NL | 04.12.2019 | PL | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | NO | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 29.09.2015 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.09.2015 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 04.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2011146291 ; | [XY]US6242135 (MUSHIAKE NAOFUMI [JP]) [X] 1-4,6 * column 1, line 59 - line 65; examples 1,2,3,5; claims 1-32 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 37 * [Y] 7,8; | [XYI]US2001024755 (BAHAR BAMDAD [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0006] , [0014] , [0062] - [0071] - [0081] - [0088] - [0093]; example 3; claims 1-23 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 5; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 51, Database accession no. 2011-J56735, XP002777659 & JP2011146291 A 20110728 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KK) [Y] 7,8 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH09219206 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , claims; paragraphs [0013] to [0014] (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH11501964 (W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.) [A] 1-8* , claims & US 5547551 A claims & WO 96/28242 A1 claims *; | [XA]US6242135 (MUSHIAKE NAOFUMI [JP]) [X] 1-4, 7, 8 * , claims; column 5, lines 12 to 17; column 5, lines 39 to 56; column 6, line 57 to column 7, line 39; column 10, lines 44 to 53 & JP 10-92444 A claims; paragraphs [0006], [0013], [0014] & WO 98/11614 A1 claims; column 7, lines 26 to 31; column 8, line 14 to column 9, line 26 * [A] 5, 6; | [A]JP2009543949 (DSM IP Assets B.V.) [A] 1-8 * , claims; paragraphs [0011] to [0018], [0033], [0049] to [0054] & US 2009/0325005 A1 paragraphs [0011] to [0018], [0035], [0053] to [0055] & WO 2008/009430 A1 column 2, line 22 to column 4, line 7; column 6, line 34 to column 7, line 11; column 11, line 2 to column 12, line 9 * |