EP3211789 - SOLAR CHARGER FOR MOBILE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2022 | Publication notification | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imaz Mazquiaran, Iñaki Avda. Tolosa 119 8ºB Guipuzcoa 20018 San Sebastian / ES | For all designated states Viñas I Aliau, Montserrat I. Avda. Tolosa 119 8ºB Guipuzcoa 20018 San Sebastian / ES | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Garcia-Cabrerizo y del Santo, Pedro Maria Av. Doctor Arce, 14 Edificio Regus 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | Garcia-Cabrerizo y del Santo, Pedro Maria Oficina Garcia Cabrerizo, S.L., Vitruvio, 23 28006 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 15848531.8 | 09.10.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015ES70736 | Priority number, date | ES20140000789 | 10.10.2014 Original published format: ES 201400789 | ES20150031442 | 07.10.2015 Original published format: ES 201531442 | [2017/35] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016055686 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | ES | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3211789 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 14.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02S40/38, H02J7/00, H01L31/042, H01M10/46 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
A45B25/00 (EP,US);
H01L31/042 (EP,US);
H01R25/006 (US);
H02J7/00 (US);
H02J7/0044 (EP,US);
H02J7/0045 (EP,US);
H02J7/35 (US);
H02S20/10 (EP,US);
H02S40/38 (EP,US);
H02S99/00 (US);
A45B2025/003 (EP,US);
A45B2200/1027 (EP,US);
G08B13/00 (US);
G08B17/00 (US);
H02J2310/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/35] | H02S40/38, H02J7/00, H01L31/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Title | German: | SOLARLADEGERÄT FÜR MOBILE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2017/35] | English: | SOLAR CHARGER FOR MOBILE DEVICES | [2017/35] | French: | CHARGEUR SOLAIRE POUR DISPOSITIFS MOBILES | [2017/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2017 | Translation filed | 09.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 09.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/10] | Public notification(s) | Noting of loss of rights pursuant to Rule 112(1) EPC (EPO Form 2021A dated 11/02/2022) | Imaz Mazquiaran, Iñaki Avda. Tolosa 119 8ºB Guipuzcoa 20018 San Sebastian / ES | [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009058354 (HARRISON SOREN DAVID [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2011140656 (STARR GARY [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,12,13 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0012] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1A-1C *; | [A]CN102772047 (XIA WANG, et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [XY]US2014028242 (AKIN SARAH [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0026] , [0031] - paragraphs [0036] , [0048] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0081]; figures 1A-1C * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0097]; figure 5A * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0107]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0111] - paragraphs [0115] , [0119] * * paragraphs [0129] , [0130] * [Y] 4-14; | [Y]US2014239717 (PROMMEL MARK [US], et al) [Y] 8-11,14 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1A-1D, 8A *; | [Y] - BOICO ET AL, "Solar Battery Chargers for NiMH Batteries", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, 2005. PESC '05. IEEE 36TH, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20050101), doi:10.1109/PESC.2005.1581616, ISBN 978-0-7803-9033-1, pages 146 - 152, XP031000171 [Y] 4 * page 146, column left - column right * * page 148, column left - page 149, column left; figures 3,4 * * page 152, column left - column right * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.2005.1581616 | [Y] - Lucy Ingham, "On-the-go solar charging is coming to a street near you - Factor", (20140305), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://factor-tech.com/future-cities/831-on-the-go-solar-charging-is-coming-to-a-street-near-you/, (20171213), XP055434635 [Y] 5 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO2012155286 (FUENTES OLLARZU RODRIGO ENRIQUE [CL], et al) [X] 1-20 * , abstract; figures, especially the 1; page 1, lines 7-10 and 22-30; page 2, lines 10-15; and page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 15. *; | [X] - LUCY INGHAM, "On-the-go solar charging is coming to a street near you", Factor-tech, Street Charge;, (20140305), URL: http://factor-tech.com/connected-world/20460-skype- co-founders-back-delivery-robots-over-drones, (20151104), XP055434635 [X] 1-20 * , all the web page. * |