EP3203878 - BED HAVING LOGIC CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sleep Number Corporation 1001 Third Avenue South Minneapolis, Minnesota 55404 / US | [2023/32] |
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states SELECT COMFORT CORPORATION 9800 59th Avenue North Minneapolis, Minnesota 55442 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALASHEWSKI, Wade Daniel 9800 59th Ave. North Minneapolis, Minnesota 55442 / US | 02 /
ERKO, Robert 9800 59th Ave. North Minneapolis, Minnesota 55442 / US | 03 /
NUNN, Robert 9800 59th Ave. North Minneapolis, Minnesota 55442 / US | 04 /
REDZIC, Gordan 9800 59th Ave. North Minneapolis, Minnesota 55442 / US | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2023/23] |
Former [2017/33] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15848662.1 | 25.09.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015US52308 | Priority number, date | US201462062817P | 10.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462062817 P | US201514675355 | 31.03.2015 Original published format: US201514675355 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016057243 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3203878 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3203878 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3203878 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A47C31/00, A47C27/08, A47C21/04 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
A47C31/00 (EP,US);
A61B5/4809 (EP,US);
A61B5/6892 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (US);
G05B2219/2608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETT MIT LOGIKSTEUERGERÄT | [2017/33] | English: | BED HAVING LOGIC CONTROLLER | [2017/33] | French: | LIT COMPORTANT UNE DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE LOGIQUE | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 12.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IE | 25.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IE | 25.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004103475 (OGAWA ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP2422700 (DELTA TOOLING CO LTD [JP]); | [XY]WO2014151733 (NUNN ROB [US], et al); | [X]WO2014151753 (NUNN ROB [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2009177327 (TURNER JASON [US], et al); | [A]WO2010138689 (L & P PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO [US], et al); | [A]US2012116187 (HAYES TAMARA [US], et al); | [Y]US2014259431 (FLEURY JOE [US], et al); | [Y]US2014259434 (NUNN ROB [US], et al) | Examination | US2012253220 |