EP3189635 - LOCATION IDENTIFIERS IN MOBILE MESSAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, WA 98006-1350 / US | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOOKER, William Michael 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, Washington 98006-1350 / US | 02 /
SEWARD, Shelby 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, Washington 98006-1350 / US | 03 /
MUFTI, Shujaur 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, Washington 98006-1350 / US | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 15848988.0 | 08.10.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015US54765 | Priority number, date | US201462062590P | 10.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462062590 P | US201514678413 | 03.04.2015 Original published format: US201514678413 | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016057838 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3189635 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3189635 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/66, H04L29/06 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04W4/12 (US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04W64/003 (US);
H04W76/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/28] | H04L12/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STANDORTIDENTIFIKATOREN IN MOBILER NACHRICHTENÜBERMITTLUNG | [2017/28] | English: | LOCATION IDENTIFIERS IN MOBILE MESSAGING | [2017/28] | French: | IDENTIFICATEURS DE LOCALISATION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE MESSAGERIE MOBILE | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 06.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19169681.4 / EP3537668 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2015 | AL | 29.05.2019 | AT | 29.05.2019 | CY | 29.05.2019 | CZ | 29.05.2019 | DK | 29.05.2019 | EE | 29.05.2019 | ES | 29.05.2019 | FI | 29.05.2019 | HR | 29.05.2019 | IT | 29.05.2019 | LT | 29.05.2019 | LV | 29.05.2019 | MC | 29.05.2019 | MK | 29.05.2019 | MT | 29.05.2019 | NL | 29.05.2019 | PL | 29.05.2019 | RO | 29.05.2019 | RS | 29.05.2019 | SE | 29.05.2019 | SI | 29.05.2019 | SK | 29.05.2019 | SM | 29.05.2019 | TR | 29.05.2019 | BG | 29.08.2019 | NO | 29.08.2019 | GR | 30.08.2019 | IS | 29.09.2019 | PT | 30.09.2019 | IE | 08.10.2019 | LU | 08.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | FR | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.10.2015 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.10.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.10.2015 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.10.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.10.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.10.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.10.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.10.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2007060097 (EDGE STEPHEN W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10 * paragraphs [0028] , [0033] , [0042] - [0045] - [0065] , [0067] , [0094]; figure 3 * [A] 4,12 [Y] 3,5,6,11,13,14; | [IAY]US2011299462 (IMBIMBO AMEDEO [IT], et al) [I] 1,2,7-10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0007] - [0016] , [0017] , [0020] , [0046] - [0062] - [0071] - [0074]; figure 3 * [A] 4,12 [Y] 3,5,6,11,13,14; | [A] - JESSKE DEUTSCHE TELEKOM K DRAGE ALCATEL-LUCENT C HOLMBERG ERICSSON R, "Private Header (P-Header) Extensions to the Session Initiation Protocol (SIP) for the 3GPP; rfc7315.txt", PRIVATE HEADER (P-HEADER) EXTENSIONS TO THE SESSION INITIATION PROTOCOL (SIP) FOR THE 3GPP; RFC7315.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARD, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20140718), pages 1 - 43, XP015104411 [A] 1-14 * Chapters 4.4 and 6.4 * | International search | [Y]US2010113063 (HAN GYUYOUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 19* entire document *; | [Y]US2010215001 (RUSSELL NICK [GB], et al) [Y] 2-6, 10-14, 16 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011035284 (MOSHFEGHI MEHRAN [US]) [Y] 4, 12, 16, 17 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011299462 (IMBIMBO AMEDEO [IT], et al) [Y] 3, 11 * entire document *; | [XY]US2012039312 (NARKAR VISHAL [US], et al) [X] 1, 7-9, 15, 20 * entire document * [Y] 2-6, 10-14, 16-19; | [Y]US2013121292 (TAN PEK-YEW [SG], et al) [Y] 18 * entire document * |