EP3206448 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONFIGURING CELL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYOO, Sunheui C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Seunghoon C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Jungsoo C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
MOON, Jungmin C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2017/33] | Application number, filing date | 15849270.2 | 08.10.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015KR10689 | Priority number, date | US201462062446P | 10.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462062446 P | [2017/33] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016056869 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3206448 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3206448 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W24/08, H04W88/08, H04W88/02, H04L5/00, H04W24/02, H04W74/00 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04W16/14 (EP,CN);
H04W28/18 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0032 (EP);
H04L5/0098 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP,CN,US);
H04W28/16 (US);
H04W36/14 (CN);
H04W72/02 (US);
H04W72/0453 (CN);
H04W72/23 (CN);
H04W74/08 (US);
H04W76/20 (US);
H04W88/02 (US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
H04W88/085 (US);
H04B7/0686 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | H04W72/02, H04W24/08, H04W74/08, H04W76/04, H04W88/08, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONFIGURATION EINER ZELLE IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2017/33] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONFIGURING CELL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2017/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONFIGURATION D'UNE CELLULE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2017 | Translation filed | 10.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 10.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20160677.9 / EP3681221 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2015 | AL | 04.03.2020 | AT | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | DK | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | ES | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | NL | 04.03.2020 | PL | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | TR | 04.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | IE | 08.10.2020 | LU | 08.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 08.10.2015 | |
AL | 04.03.2020 | ||
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 08.10.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.10.2015 | |
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 08.10.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 08.10.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012134567 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0029] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0034] *; | [Y]US2012250631 (HAKOLA SAMI-JUKKA [FI], et al) [Y] 1,6,10,13 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] *; | [Y]WO2013023354 (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 2,7,11,14 * paragraphs [0039] , [0046] *; | [Y]WO2014007593 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 3-5,8,9,12,15 * paragraphs [0072] , [0126] - [0137] *; | [P]US2015189627 (YANG SUCKCHEL [KR], et al) [P] * corresponding paragraphs *; | [A] - NOKIA CORPORATION ET AL, "Motivation for New SI proposal: LTE Carrier Aggregation Enhancement Beyond 5 Carriers", vol. TSG RAN, no. Edinburgh, UK; 20140909 - 20140912, (20140902), 3GPP DRAFT; RP-141417, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/Docs/, (20140902), XP050783750 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - NOKIA CORPORATION ET AL, "New SI proposal: LTE Carrier Aggregation Enhancement Beyond 5 Carriers", vol. TSG RAN, no. Edinburgh, UK; 20140909 - 20140912, (20140902), 3GPP DRAFT; RP-141418, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/Docs/, (20140902), XP050783751 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2013029606 (WANG FENG [US], et al) [A] 1-54 * See paragraphs [0014]-[0024]; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2013337821 (CLEGG MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-54* See paragraphs [0044]-[0093]; and figures 3-10. *; | [A] - ALCATEL -LUCENT et al., "Channel Selection for Licensed-Assisted Access", R1-144082, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #78bis, (20140927), XP050872825 [A] 1-54 * See pages 2, 3. * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Deployment scenarios and evaluation methodologies for LAA''.", R1-143880, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #78bis, (20140927), XP050875193 [A] 1-54 * See pages 1-3. * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Deployment scenarios for LAA", R1-144043, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #78bis, (20140927), XP050869705 [A] 1-54 * See pages 1-5. * | Examination | US2012257601 |