EP3205721 - TRANSFORMANT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING LACTIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JMTC Enzyme Corporation 8-17-5, Ginza Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARA, Futoshi c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
KASHIMA, Ayako c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
KIMURA, Shuichiro c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15849633.1 | 06.10.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015JP78394 | Priority number, date | JP20140209048 | 10.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014209048 | [2017/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016056566 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205721 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3205721 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N1/19, C12P7/56, C12R1/645, C12N9/04, C12N1/16, C12N15/81, C12N9/88 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
C12P7/56 (EP,US);
C12N1/145 (US);
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12N9/0006 (EP,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,US);
C12Y101/01027 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | C12N15/09, C12N1/19, C12P7/56, C12R1/645 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSFORMANT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MILCHSÄURE | [2017/33] | English: | TRANSFORMANT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING LACTIC ACID | [2017/33] | French: | TRANSFORMANT, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDE LACTIQUE | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2017 | Translation filed | 28.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 28.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.10.2015 | AL | 28.08.2019 | AT | 28.08.2019 | CY | 28.08.2019 | CZ | 28.08.2019 | DK | 28.08.2019 | EE | 28.08.2019 | FI | 28.08.2019 | HR | 28.08.2019 | LT | 28.08.2019 | LV | 28.08.2019 | MC | 28.08.2019 | MK | 28.08.2019 | MT | 28.08.2019 | PL | 28.08.2019 | RO | 28.08.2019 | RS | 28.08.2019 | SE | 28.08.2019 | SI | 28.08.2019 | SK | 28.08.2019 | SM | 28.08.2019 | TR | 28.08.2019 | IE | 06.10.2019 | LU | 06.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | BG | 28.11.2019 | NO | 28.11.2019 | GR | 29.11.2019 | IS | 28.12.2019 | PT | 30.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.10.2015 | |
AL | 28.08.2019 | ||
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
MT | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IE | 06.10.2019 | ||
LU | 06.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 06.10.2015 | |
AL | 28.08.2019 | ||
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IE | 06.10.2019 | ||
LU | 06.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IE | 06.10.2019 | ||
LU | 06.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IE | 06.10.2019 | ||
LU | 06.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LU | 06.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LU | 06.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LU | 06.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 28.08.2019 | |
NO | 28.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003228671 (HAUSE BEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0055] , [0057] , [0 62] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0071] - [0074] , [0 89] * * claims 1-56 *; | [A]EP1975232 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 28] , [0031] * * paragraph [0058] *; | [A]US2012214214 (HARA FUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-15 * * examples 1-9 *; | [Y]WO2014030655 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * tables 13,14 *; | [AP]US2015044740 (KIM SUNG-SOO [KR], et al) [AP] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] ** example 6 *; | [P]US2015232895 (HARA FUTOSHI [JP], et al) [P] * example 3 * * tables 13, 14 * * paragraphs [0160] , [ 162] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0115] *; | [A] - BRANDUARDI PAOLA ET AL, "Lactate production yield from engineered yeasts is dependent from the host background, the lactate dehydrogenase source and the lactate export", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, (20060130), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1475-2859-5-4, ISSN 1475-2859, page 4, XP021017792 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2859-5-4 | [A] - SAUER M ET AL, "16 Years research on lactic acid production with yeast - Ready for the market?", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND GENETIC ENGINEERING REV, INTERCEPT LTD., ANDOVER, GB, (20100101), vol. 27, doi:10.1080/02648725.2010.10648152, ISSN 0264-8725, pages 229 - 256, XP009181318 [A] 1-15 * page 237, paragraph l - page 238, line 3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/02648725.2010.10648152 | International search | [X]WO2011021629 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * , claims 1 to 3; example 2; paragraph [0035] & US 2012/0214214 A1 claims 1 to 3; example 2; paragraph [0072] & EP 2468860 A1 & JP 5772594 B2 *; | [X]WO2014030655 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * , claims 1 to 3; example 2; paragraph [0048] & US 2015/0232895 A1 claims 1 to 3; example 2; paragraph [0093] *; | [A] - FUTOSHI HARA et al., "Lactate production using Schizosaccharomyces pombe", The 61st Abstracts of the Annual Meeting of the Society for Biotechnology, Japan, (20090000), page 190, XP008151368 [A] 1-15 * , 2Mp08 * |