EP3204226 - HIGH-PERFORMANCE COATED SEALANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jindal Films Americas LLC 411 Pegasus Parkway LaGrange, GA 30240 / US | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DABADIE, Thierry, JL 24 rue Xavier de Feller L-1514 Luxembourg / LU | 02 /
CHANTRAINE, Laurent 5 rue de La Victoire L-8047 Strassen Grand Duchy of Luxembourg / LU | 03 /
SUNDARARAMAN, Anand 115 Woodgreen Drive Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 04 /
GOHR, Eric T. 11431 Village Avenue Midwest City, OK 74075 / US | 05 /
HUBBARD, Michael A. 1523 N. Skyline Street Stillwater, OK 74075 / US | 06 /
MENDES, Lindsay J. 1215 Millford Court Naperville, IL 60564 / US | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Johnson, Yvonne Catherine Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15849783.4 | 09.10.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015US55016 | Priority number, date | US201462061746P | 09.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462061746 P | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016057969 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3204226 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/26, C08J7/04 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
B32B25/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B32B25/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/16 (EP,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
C08J7/042 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/052 (EP,US);
B29B9/06 (US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C48/345 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/20 (EP,US);
B32B2255/205 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2255/28 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/31 (EP,US);
B32B2307/402 (EP,US);
B32B2307/41 (EP,US);
B32B2307/50 (EP,US);
B32B2307/514 (EP,US);
B32B2307/546 (EP,US);
B32B2307/746 (EP,US);
B32B2307/75 (EP,US);
B32B2439/06 (EP,US);
B32B2439/46 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | B32B3/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Title | German: | HOCHLEISTUNGSFÄHIGE BESCHICHTETE DICHTUNGSMITTEL | [2017/33] | English: | HIGH-PERFORMANCE COATED SEALANTS | [2017/33] | French: | MATÉRIAUX D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ REVÊTUS HAUTE PERFORMANCE | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 05.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0186279 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1,15 * claim 1 * * column 8, line 34 - column 14, line 40 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]US4944990 (LIU LELAND L [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * claim 1 * * column 8, line 11 - line 15 * * column 8, line 23 - line 28 * * column 8, line 34 - column 9, line 10 * [I] 2-14; | [I]WO9847956 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 4, line 14 - line 16 * * page 9, line 15 - line 20 * * page 12, line 9 - page 16, line 10 *; | [I]WO2010008696 (EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * claim 18 * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0142] *; | [A] - Zahra Najarzadeh ET AL, "UNIVERSITÉ DE MONTRÉAL CONTROL AND OPTIMIZATION OF SEALING LAYER IN FILMS", (20140430), URL: https://publications.polymtl.ca/1406/1/2014_ZahraNajarzadeh.pdf, (20180516), XP055475742 [A] 1 * page 4 - page 17 * | [A] - F C Stehling ET AL, "HEAT SEALING OF SEMICRYSTALLINE POLYMER FILMS. II. EFFECT FO MELTING DISTRIBUTION ON HEAT-SEALING BEHAVIOR OF POLYOLEFINS", (19940101), pages 105 - 119, URL: https://services.readcube.com/reader/pdf?ticket=49e4db4b-13cd-4ffb-8250-c4312f03ce02, (20180516), XP055475739 [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5529834 (TSAI MINGLIANG L [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [XY]US5827615 (TOUHSAENT ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-15, 19, 20 * entire document * [Y] 16-18; | [Y]US2006057318 (TACHINO HITOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 18 * entire document *; | [A]US2007020448 (HUBBARD MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2012308789 (LOCKHART MARK W [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2013323513 (HUBBARD MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US8932725 (KOEHN HAROLD EGON [US], et al) [Y] 16, 17 * entire document * |