EP3206871 - MULTILAYER INTERLAYER HAVING SOUND DAMPING PROPERTIES OVER A BROAD TEMPERATURE RANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solutia Inc. 575 Maryville Centre Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63141 / US | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Jun 16 Stonehill Road East Longmeadow, MA 01028 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Wenjie 40 Kestrel Lane Amherst, MA 01002 / US | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/34] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15850013.2 | 15.10.2015 | [2017/34] | WO2015US55633 | Priority number, date | US201414514641 | 15.10.2014 Original published format: US201414514641 | US201514882317 | 13.10.2015 Original published format: US201514882317 | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016061295 | Date: | 21.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3206871 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, B32B27/08, B32B7/02, B32B27/22, B32B27/30, B32B27/36, B32B27/42 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B27/22 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B32B27/30 (US);
B32B27/306 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B27/308 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/365 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/42 (EP,CN,US);
B32B7/022 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60J1/2094 (US);
E06B5/12 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (CN,KR,US);
B32B2250/246 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2307/102 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2307/536 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | B32B17/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE ZWISCHENSCHICHT MIT SCHALLDÄMPFENDEN EIGENSCHAFTEN ÜBER EINEN BREITEN TEMPERATURBEREICH | [2017/34] | English: | MULTILAYER INTERLAYER HAVING SOUND DAMPING PROPERTIES OVER A BROAD TEMPERATURE RANGE | [2017/34] | French: | COUCHE INTERMÉDIAIRE FORMANT MULTICOUCHE AYANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS D'AMORTISSEMENT SONORE SUR UNE LARGE PLAGE DE TEMPÉRATURES | [2017/34] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 25.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP24192370.5 / EP4431281 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006210782 (LU JUN [US]); | [Y]US2006210776 (LU JUN [US], et al); | [AP]WO2014200993 (SOLUTIA INC [US]) | International search | [A]WO2006101960 (SOLUTIA INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2007021989 (SOLUTIA INC [US], et al); | [A]US2007148472 (MASAKI YUUJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2013236711 (LU JUN [US]); | [A]US2013236693 (LU JUN [US]) |